Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 1:23-cv-01209
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 07, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 1:22 AM PST
Defendant
Medford Spartan V, LLC
Represented By
Eric (Skip) Winters
Chinn Smith Winters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Moses
Represented By
Ashley A. Marton
Cambreleng & Marton LLC
contact info
Rebecca Cambreleng
Cambreleng & Marton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
10 10 order Judgment Tue 11/07 2:02 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice and without fees or costs. Signed on 11/7/2023 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 11/03 12:19 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cambreleng, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Mon 10/30 3:57 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer7 . Answer is due by 11/3/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Fri 10/20 3:50 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint,1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Medford Spartan V, LLC. (Winters, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Mon 10/16 3:43 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer5 . Answer is due by 10/20/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Wed 10/04 1:48 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Medford Spartan V, LLC. (Winters, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/21 1:48 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Medford Spartan V, LLC served on 9/15/2023, answer due on 10/6/2023 Filed by Benjamin Moses. (Cambreleng, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/18 1:41 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Medford Spartan V, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 08/18 1:37 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 12/18/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/16/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 1/16/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/18 1:30 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9052002 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Benjamin Moses against Medford Spartan V, LLC. (Cambreleng, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons