California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Case #: 5:23-cv-04233
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 29, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court, County of Santa Clara, 23CV417694
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 12:54 AM PST
Defendant
Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Represented By
Laura E. Heyne
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Michael Afar
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabrielle E Carrick
Represented By
Vincent Charles Granberry
Lavi And Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info
Courtney Marisa Miller
Lavi And Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info
Joseph Lavi
Lavi And Ebrahimian LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2023
ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on December 21, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2023)
GPO Nov 29 2024
ORDER granting 39 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 11/29/2024. (lrt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 29, 2024
40 40 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/29 8:22 AM
ORDER granting 39 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice . Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 11/29/2024. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
39 39 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/25 3:11 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order Lifting Stay Fri 10/04 4:50 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2025. Status Conference set for 1/22/2025 at 01:30 PM by zoom before Judge Eumi K Lee. Stay Lifted. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 10/4/2024. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 09/17 2:01 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:37 Case Management Statement filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
37 37 misc Case Management Statement Mon 09/16 2:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/21 11:14 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Eumi K Lee. Judge P. Casey Pitts no longer assigned to the case. (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
36 36 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Tue 08/20 2:54 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Eumi K. Lee in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials EKL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lee by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court?s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after December 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before December 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before September 16, 2024 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlines in the [LINK:Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District.] the approved form for such statements can be accessed [LINK:here] : a. The parties are not required to complete a section if inapplicable. As number 20, the statement shall provide the following information: (i) a list or description of each party; (ii) a summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims and the date the complaint and cross-complaint(s) were filed; and (iii) a brief procedural history of the case (chart format welcomed) including, but not limited to, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded and any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded. b. If the parties believe that an immediate case management conference is needed, the parties shall explain why and identify the urgent matters that require attention. If there is no immediate need, a case management conference will be scheduled or reset pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order as needed. 9. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 08/20/2024 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
35 35 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 07/30 10:13 AM
ORDER granting 34 Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 7/30/2024. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/29 3:02 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims Without Prejudice filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/29 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. of Withdrawal of Document (Dkt. 31) (Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/29 12:56 PM
ORDER granting 31 Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 7/29/2024. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 07/26 4:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Class Action Claims Without Prejudice filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 06/03 4:38 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Status Of Class Action by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 6:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Boal (Boal, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
28 28 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/03 3:39 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (kab, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 05/03 3:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE 23-cv-04233-SVK. Signed by Judge Chief Judge Richard Seeborg for the Executive Committee on 05/02/2024. (kab, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Fri 05/03 3:34 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE 23-cv-04233-SVK with 24-cv-00212-PCP. Signed by Judge van Keulen on 05/02/2024. (kab, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 4:10 PM
NOTICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding [Civ.L.R. 3-13](Koenig, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Stay,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ntc of Pendency
Thursday, December 21, 2023
24 24 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 12/21 4:36 PM
ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on December 21, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Change In Counsel Fri 11/10 8:46 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Courtney Marisa Miller (Miller, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 10/30 1:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/21/23 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/23 is VACATED pending ruling on Motion to Dismiss/Stay12 ; the Court will re-set if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 09/25 3:35 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 10/10/23 MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. The Motion to Dismiss12 Hearing set for 10/10/23 at 10:00 AM is vacated; the Court will decide the motion on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
20 20 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 09/22 9:54 AM
REPLY Related [+] Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay filed byPeloton Interactive, Inc.. (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Stay
Monday, September 18, 2023
19 19 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/18 2:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gabrielle E Carrick.. (Miller, Courtney)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/18 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to L.R. 3-13 (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
17 17 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 09/15 7:08 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byGabrielle E Carrick. (Miller, Courtney)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Stay
Thursday, September 14, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 09/14 8:45 AM
FINAL CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 09/06 9:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/05 2:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peloton Interactive, Inc... (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/05 9:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 09/01 1:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Stay filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 9/15/2023. Replies due by 9/22/2023.(Heyne, Laura) Modified on 9/1/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Laura E. Heyne,
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 24, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/24 3:17 PM
NOTICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. Of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1446(D) (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 08/23 1:47 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Afar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 08/22 2:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. re 7 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 08/21 1:56 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 08/21 10:30 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 08/18 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peloton Interactive, Inc. re5 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Declaration in Support,2 Declaration in Support,1 Notice of Removal,4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 08/18 3:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peloton Interactive, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 08/18 3:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Peloton Interactive, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 08/18 3:16 PM
Declaration of Laura E. Heyne in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed byPeloton Interactive, Inc.. Related [+] (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 08/18 3:12 PM
Declaration of Cole Wurmstich in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed byPeloton Interactive, Inc.. Related [+] (Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 23CV417694. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18561344). Filed byPeloton Interactive, Inc..(Heyne, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet