New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Rachel P Kovner
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:23-cv-06251
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Marcos Cordova
Defendant
The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc.
Plaintiff
Luis Santos
Represented By
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, June 17, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/17 10:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The28 notice of voluntary dismissal is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 6/17/2024. (SP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/14 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/28 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Court's May 22, 2024 Order served on Defendants The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. and Marcos Cordova on May 28, 2024, filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Class Mail Receipt
Friday, May 24, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 05/24 10:55 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Withdraw without Prejudice and with Leave to Renew18 Motion for Default Judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/24/2024. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
26 26 motion Withdraw Thu 05/23 5:43 PM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw18 MOTION for Default Judgment without Prejudice and with Leave to Renew by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Luis Santos (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 05/22 1:55 PM
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held on 5/22/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearance by Anne Seelig for plaintiff. Defendants The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. and Marcos Cordova failed to appear despite receiving notice of the hearing. See Dkt. 24. Plaintiff's counsel advised the Court that the subject bar appears to have closed its business. Plaintiff further informed the Court of a number of discrepancies with his damages calculation. The Court informed plaintiff of several deficiencies regarding the pending18 motion for default judgment, including the ineffectiveness of service of process on the individual defendant. By 5/23/2024 , plaintiff shall file a letter seeking leave to withdraw the motion for default judgment without prejudice and with leave to renew. By 6/21/2024 , plaintiff shall either re-file the motion for default judgment that addresses the issues raised by the Court or file an application for an extension of time to complete service on the individual defendant. By 5/28/2024 , plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on defendants and file proof of service on ECF. (Cisco Recording.) (JDP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/16 6:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for (1) Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants dated April 16, 2024, Dkt. No18 , (2) The Notice to Defendants re: Telephone Hearing scheduled for May 22, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. Dkt. No23 and (3) The full Docket sheet on Defendants served on The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. and Marcos Cordova c/o The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. served on The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. and Marcos Cordova c/o The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. on 04/16/2024, filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Class Mail Receipt
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/16 3:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:18 Motion for Default Judgment against defendants The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. and Marcos Cordova filed by plaintiff Luis Santos. A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call 833-990-9400 and use Meeting ID 709-478-501# . Although defendants have not previously appeared, defendants may participate in the conference. Counsel and the parties should be prepared to discuss plaintiff's pending motion for default judgment. As per the attached Notice to Defendant, by 4/19/2024 , plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order, the attached Notice, and the full docket sheet on defendants at the mailing addresses listed in the attached Notice and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/16/2024. (EJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 04/12 4:00 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: docket entry has been deleted. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
order Order Referring Motion Wed 12/06 10:50 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The18 motion for default judgment is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Cho. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 12/6/2023. (SP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 service Certificate of Service Tue 12/05 6:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luis Santos re18 MOTION for Default Judgment ,21 Memorandum in Support,19 Affidavit in Support of Motion,20 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
21 21 14 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 12/05 10:26 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re18 MOTION for Default Judgment ,19 Affidavit in Support of Motion,20 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 12/05 10:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re18 MOTION for Default Judgment Declaration of Luis Santos filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 12/05 10:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re18 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
18 18 motion Default Judgment Tue 12/05 10:22 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 11/28 4:14 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Marcos Cordova has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Marcos Cordova is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
16 16 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Fri 11/17 5:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re15 Request for Certificate of Default by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
15 15 misc Request for Certificate of Default Fri 11/17 5:37 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 11/15 10:23 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Certificate of Default - Denied Wed 11/15 10:25 AM
REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time as to Defendant Marcos Cordova. It does not appear from the affidavit of service that military status for Defendant Marcos Cordova has been identified. re12 Request for Certificate of Default (JP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
13 13 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Tue 11/07 10:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re12 Request for Certificate of Default by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
12 12 misc Request for Certificate of Default Tue 11/07 10:47 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
order Status Report Order Thu 10/26 9:03 AM
ORDER: By 11/7/2023 , plaintiff's counsel shall request a Clerk's Entry of Default. Within 30 days of entry of default, counsel shall move for default judgment in accordance with the District Judge's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/26/2023. (TT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Wed 10/25 3:25 PM
Letter requesting extension of time to request the certificate of default by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/18 12:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Santos. Marcos Cordova served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
order Order(Other) Wed 10/11 3:00 PM
ORDER: By 10/25/2023 , plaintiff's counsel shall request a Clerk's Entry of Default. Within 30 days of entry of default, counsel shall move for default judgment in accordance with the District Judge's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/11/2023. (TT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Tue 10/10 5:29 PM
STATUS REPORT by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 10/03 4:52 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel is directed to file a status report letter by 10/10/2023 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/3/2023. (TT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/08 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Santos. The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. served on 8/22/2023, answer due 9/12/2023. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 08/21 11:48 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 08/21 11:47 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/21 11:47 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Marcos Cordova
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/21 11:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
4 4 misc Consent to Become Party (Collective Action) Fri 08/18 6:12 PM
CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/18 6:12 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/18 6:11 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Luis Santos (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/18 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Marcos Cordova, The Ridgewood Ale House, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17006913 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Luis Santos. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]