South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Case #: 3:23-cv-04037
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Terminated:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Jordyn Nicole D'Andrea
Womble Bond Dickinson Us Llp (chas)
contact info
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Jordyn Nicole D'Andrea
Womble Bond Dickinson Us Llp (chas)
contact info
Plaintiff
Camden Pallet, LLC
Represented By
Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Rikard And Protopapas LLC
contact info
Cody Tarlton Mitchell
Auman Law Firm
contact info
Robert G Rikard
Rikard And Protopapas LLC
contact info
Peter D Protopapas
Rikard And Protopapas LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
18 18 misc Document Mailed Thu 08/29 11:15 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED16 Order, NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kershaw Common Pleas for Janet C. Hasty PO Box 1557 Camden, SC 29021-8557. (apsn)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Document E-Mailed Thu 08/29 11:11 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED16 Order, NEF, to Janet C. Hasty at janet.hasty@kershaw.sc.gov. (apsn)
Related: [-]
16 16 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/29 11:00 AM
ORDER:The court GRANTS Camden Pallet, LLC's motion to remand, ECF No. 9 , and remands this matter back to the Court of Common Pleas for Kershaw County. Signed by Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 08/29/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 motion Stay Fri 02/16 4:54 PM
MOTION to Stay by Camden Pallet, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barnwell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/30 3:59 PM
CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/20/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 3/5/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 5/9/2024, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/10/2024, Discovery due by 7/29/2024, Motions due by 8/12/2024, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/7/2024, case to be called to during the October 2024 term of court, and Mediation Due by 8/26/2024. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on January 30, 2024. (ahil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
12 12 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 09/20 2:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Camden Pallet, LLC.. Refiled by Clerk to correct the filing event.(ahil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A, Denial Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B, Redmond Rep,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C, 11-1-22 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D, Order Granting Motion to Compel
Friday, September 15, 2023
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/15 1:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/22/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(D'Andrea, Jordyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena to Camden Pallet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Powers Roofing & Homes Invoice
Friday, September 01, 2023
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 09/01 3:22 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Camden Pallet, LLC.(Barnwell, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand Fri 09/01 2:53 PM
MOTION to Remand by Camden Pallet, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/15/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barnwell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A, Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B, Camden Pallet Dep,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C, Powers Roofing Sketch,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D, Proof of ADR,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E, Mot to Continue,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F, Consent Order for Continuance,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G, 6.21.23 Boykin email,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H, Signature Page to Cumbie Settlement Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I, Powers Settlement AGreement,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. J, Powers Resp to INT,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. K, Powers Resp to RFP
Monday, August 21, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/21 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordyn Nicole D'Andrea on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (D'Andrea, Jordyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/21 11:18 AM
DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(ahil)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/21 11:10 AM
DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(ahil) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit text (ahil)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 08/18 9:17 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document1 Notice of Removal,,. First attachment description: Additional Exhibit A documents . (D'Andrea, Jordyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/18 8:57 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (ahil)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 08/18 8:56 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(ahil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/18 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kershaw County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-28-533. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11266036), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(ahil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A State Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B State Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendants JP Cumbie Insurance LLC and Joseph Paul Cumbie,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Powers Roofing Only,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Deposition Excerpt,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Condensed Depo Transcript,
Att: 6 Exhibit F Estimate