California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-71235
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 19, 2023 12:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Jorge Jair Alas-Avila (1)
Represented By
Sophia Maria Whiting
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of California
contact info

GPO Aug 31 2023
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jorge Jair Alas-Avila. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/31/2023. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
GPO Sep 11 2023
COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Jorge Jair Alas-Avila. Defendant committed to District of District of Oregon.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/31/2023. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)

Docket last updated: 08/19/2023 1:13 AM PDT
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
Arrest of Jorge Jair Alas-Avila in Northern District of California. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Jorge Jair Alas-Avila (1). (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/17/2023) Attachments
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Initial Appearance as to Jorge Jair Alas-Avila held on 8/17/2023; Arraignment Not held on 8/17/2023; Added attorney Sophia Maria Whiting for Jorge Jair Alas-Avila. Remanded to custody. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Arraignment on Indictment set for 8/22/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Detention Hearing set for 8/22/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 8/22/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 14, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Recording Time Liberty 11:01-11:07. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jorge Jair Alas-Avila (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]