Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Case #: 0:23-cv-61592
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Gordon Riley Duncan
contact info
Mediator
Charles A Mancuso
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
Represented By
Samantha Lyn Simpson
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Steven Sconzo
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 24, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 05/24 11:25 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 05/23 2:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 01/22 1:16 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Charles A. Mancuso. Mediation Hearing set for 7/10/2024 08:00 AM Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 01/19 4:23 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Charles A Mancuso as Mediator.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 05, 2024
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 01/05 12:07 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 1/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 9:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 12/6/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
17 17 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 01/04 12:40 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Cohan(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 22, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/22 11:14 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC. (Duncan, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/08 11:25 AM
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. ORDER DENYING13 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file its answer on or before December 22, 2023. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 12/08 11:26 AM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC response/answer due 12/22/2023. Per Order, DE#15 . (nan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/16 11:20 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Howard Cohan. Replies due by 11/27/2023. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 11/02 9:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2023 (Duncan, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 10/20 1:32 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS. ORDER denying as moot8 Motion to Dismiss. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (the Motion) [DE8 ], filed on September 21, 2023. On October 19, 2023, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint [DE 11] and, therefore, the Motion [DE 8] is now moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/19/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 10/19 11:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/10 5:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have through and including October 19, 2023 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Related [+]. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-] sponses due by 10/19/2023
Thursday, October 05, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/05 1:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 10/19/2023(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 21, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 09/21 4:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC. Attorney Gordon Riley Duncan added to party EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/5/2023 (Duncan, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against EHP Plantation Ventures, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16854163, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)