Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:23-cv-00645
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Case in other court:Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, 23-CA-008432
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Vivaldi
an individual 9493 Venezia Plantation Dr.
Orlando, FL 32829
Represented By
Marc A. Burton
Marc Burton
contact info
Defendant
American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Aaron Holt
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Daniel E. Farrington
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Garrett S Kamen
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Lauren Goetzl
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Alaina Trocano
Represented By
Kevin J. Drummond
Blue Line Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Enrique Nieves, III
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
American Airlines Group, Inc.
Terminated: 01/22/2024
Represented By
Michael Aaron Holt
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Daniel E. Farrington
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Lauren Goetzl
Fisher & Phillips
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
98 98 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 03/05 10:27 AM
ORDER granting 97 Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/5/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
utility Set / Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings - PUBLIC Wed 03/05 10:38 AM
Set / Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial statement due by 10/17/2025; All other motions due by 10/13/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 11/3/2025 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
97 97 motion Continue Tue 03/04 4:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines by American Airlines, Inc.. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
96 96 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Mon 03/03 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference and trial are rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 5/5/2025 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (RKR)
Related: [-]
95 95 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 3:05 PM
ORDER resetting remaining deadlines. See Order for details. Notice to issue. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/3/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
utility Set / Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings - PUBLIC Mon 03/03 3:06 PM
Set / Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial meeting due by 3/28/2025; Pretrial statement due by 4/11/2025; All other motions due by 4/7/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]