Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01296
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 2:33 AM PST
Defendant
Marquis Edwards
106 Briarwood Road
Waycross, GA 31501
Defendant
Damon Lovell
2903 Valerian Lane
Upper Marlboro, MD 27704
Defendant
Kenneth Rucker
6136 Frisco Square Blvd
Frisco, TX 75034
Plaintiff
James H Dillard, II
21 Raptors View Avenue
North Las Vegas, NV 89031


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Reopen Case Tue 06/11 8:41 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion to Reinstate Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's prior Motions, 11 , 12 and 14 to Reinstate are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may not file any more documents in this closed case. If Plaintiff seeks to initiate a new lawsuit, he may submit to the Clerk of the Court a new complaint and either an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
16 16 cmp Complaint Amended Thu 06/06 9:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marquis Edwards, Damon Lovell, Kenneth Rucker by James H Dillard, II. No changes to parties. (MAM)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion Reopen Case Thu 06/06 9:15 AM
MOTION to Reinstate by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. Responses due by 6/15/2024. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/23 12:13 PM
MOTION to Reinstate by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. Responses due by 6/6/2024.(CT) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 2 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 3 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 4 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 5 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 6 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 7 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 8 Document submitted for filing
Thursday, April 25, 2024
12 12 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/29 4:33 PM
MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Complaint by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. Responses due by 5/9/2024.(CT) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 2 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 3 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 4 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 5 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 6 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 7 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 8 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 9 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 10 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 11 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 12 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 13 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 14 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 15 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 16 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 17 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 18 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 19 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 20 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 21 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 22 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 23 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 24 Document submitted for filing,
Att: 25 Document submitted for filing
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
11 11 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/25 1:29 PM
MOTION to Reinstate Complaint by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. Responses due by 5/8/2024. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/11 3:44 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiff's1 -1 Complaint, for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction, and DENIES as moot his1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
9 9 respm Brief Mon 10/02 10:06 AM
BRIEF by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
minord Minute Order Mon 09/18 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2023. On August 8, 2023, the Court entered the 6 Order requiring Plaintiff James. H. Dillard, II ("Plaintiff") show cause as to what statutory basis this Court has to exercise jurisdiction over his [1-1] Complaint. On September 11, 2023, Plaintiff filed the 7 Response. While unclear, Plaintiff's 7 Response shows he is bringing only state law causes of action. Therefore, the Court assumes Plaintiff is trying to assert jurisdiction over this action under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Assuming Plaintiff alleges the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this action, he fails to specify citizenship for all parties. ( See generally Compl.); ( see also Resp.). Further, the amount in controversy does not appear, on the face of the [1-1] Complaint, to exceed $75,000.00. Should Plaintiff invoke diversity jurisdiction, Plaintiff must show that the complete diversity requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)(1) is satisfied in this case and that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000.00. Plaintiff shall have until October 1, 2023, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JD)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
7 7 respm Response Tue 09/12 10:25 AM
RESPONSE to 6 Minute Order, by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II.(JQC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Copy of Minute Order
Monday, August 28, 2023
minord Minute Order Mon 08/28 12:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/28/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff James H. Dillard, II (Plaintiff) show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to allege that this Court has jurisdiction over this matter. Federal subject matter jurisdiction must have a statutory basis. The primary sources of federal subject matter jurisdiction are federal question jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. Section 1331, diversity jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. Section 1332, and supplemental jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. Section 1367. Plaintiffs [1-1] Complaint neither identifies what statutory basis this Court has to exercise jurisdiction, nor is it apparent from the face of Plaintiffs Complaint that the Court has jurisdiction. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until September 11, 2023, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, addressing the Courts concerns regarding jurisdiction. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
minord Minute Order Recusal Wed 08/23 9:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Wed 08/23 9:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01296-GMN-NJK . (no image attached) (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
3 3 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 08/22 8:06 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
2 2 misc Consent for Electronic Service of Documents Tue 08/22 8:05 AM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II. (JQC)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/22 8:04 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James H Dillard, II.(JQC) Modified to correct attachment descriptions on 8/22/2023 (CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 08/21 2:05 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (CAH)
Related: [-]