North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: Joe L Webster
Case #: 1:23-cv-00710
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Case in other court:ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, 23CVS376
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:27 AM EST
Defendant
QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By
LEWIS ANDREW WATSON
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Mediator
SCOTT C. HART
Plaintiff
PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By
RAFORD W. BUSSEY, JR
Holder Padgett Littlejohn & Prickett
contact info
JEFFREY REMINGTON HUGGINS
Huggins Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 09, 2025
46 46 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/09 3:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (BUSSEY, RAFORD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
utility Case Reported Settled Wed 11/27 8:07 AM
Case Reported Settled see Doc. 45. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 1/10/2025. (rw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
45 45 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 11/26 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint with Plaintiff Presque Isle Villas Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc. by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (WATSON, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
44 44 adr Report of Mediator Tue 11/26 10:50 AM
REPORT OF MEDIATOR from Scott C. Hart - Mediation Held on 11/18/2024. (IMPASSE) (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
43 43 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/08 4:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. for Plaintiff's 2nd Set of Discovery Responses (TURNER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
42 42 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/30 3:41 PM
ORDER signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 9/30/2024; that the defendant's motion to dismiss the plaintiff's breach of contract claim, Doc.28 , is DENIED. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
41 41 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/18 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. of Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery Responses (HUGGINS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
utility Motions Submitted Mon 09/16 3:05 PM
Motions Submitted:28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (rw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
40 40 misc Certificate-Other Fri 09/13 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE Certification of Word Count by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BURGESS, JASON)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 09/13 2:50 PM
RESPONSE in Support re37 Brief, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim filed by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. Replies due by 9/27/2024 (BURGESS, JASON)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/06 9:02 AM
Reset Reply Deadline re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim . Replies due by 9/19/2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
38 38 misc Certificate-Other Thu 09/05 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATE re37 Brief, Plaintiff's Certification of Word Count by Plaintiff PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (BUSSEY, RAFORD)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Brief Thu 09/05 5:08 PM
Plaintiff's BRIEF and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim by Plaintiff PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. filed by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (BUSSEY, RAFORD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Joint Motion Wed 09/04 11:43 AM
ORDER signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 9/4/2024; THAT: 1. The Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Discovery Completion and Trial, Doc.35 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 2. The discovery deadline is EXTENDED to December 10, 2024. Any dispositive motions SHALL be filed no later than January 10, 2025. Counsel shall arrange their schedules to permit briefing to occur without extension. 3. The motion is DENIED to the extent the parties seek to continue the trial date and associated pretrial deadlines. The deadlines set forth by order filed June 27, 2024, Doc.23 , remain in place. (sh) (Main Document 36 replaced on 9/4/2024 with corrected January date.) (sh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 09/04 12:21 PM
Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/10/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2025. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Motions Submitted Tue 09/03 1:22 PM
Motions Submitted:35 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Discovery Completion and Trial to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (rw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
35 35 motion Joint Motion Tue 08/27 10:30 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Discovery Completion and Trial by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION.(WATSON, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion
Friday, August 23, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/23 9:53 AM
Reset Response Deadline re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim . Response to Motion due by 9/5/2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/22 3:17 PM
TEXT ORDER granting in part34 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the Motion (Docket Entry 34) is Granted in part such that Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 5, 2024, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall not anticipate any further extension of said deadline. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 8/22/2024.(pl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
utility Motions Referred Wed 08/21 11:06 AM
Motions Referred: RE:34 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (rw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 08/21 7:09 PM
TEXT ORDER Dismissing without prejudice25 "Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation's Motion to Compel." Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation ("Defendant") moves the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and 45 to compel non-party Precision Claim Consultants, LLC ("Precision") to produce discovery in response to Defendant's subpoena. ( See Docket Entry 25 at 1.) Precision has not responded. "On notice to other parties and all affected persons, a party may move for an order compelling disclosure or discovery." Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1). However, "[a] motion for an order to a nonparty must be made in the court where the discovery is or will be taken." Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(2) (emphasis added). Accordingly, upon issuance of document subpoena, "the serving party may move the court for the district where compliance is required for an order compelling production or inspection." Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(d)(2)(B)(i) (emphasis added); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(g) ("The court for the district where compliance is required-and also, after a motion is transferred, the issuing court-may hold in contempt a person who, having been served, fails without adequate excuse to obey the subpoena...."). Here, Defendant's subpoena set the location for discovery as Charlotte, NC. ( See Docket Entry 25 at 6.) Therefore, Defendant must file its motion to compel in the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina-the court which encompasses Mecklenburg County, in which Charlotte, NC is located. See 28 U.S.C. § 113(c); see also Sacks Holdings, Inc. v. Grin Nat. USA Ltd., No. 1:23CV1058, 2024 WL 3535390, at *1 (M.D.N.C. July 25, 2024). Therefore, it is ordered that Defendant's motion (Docket Entry 25) is denied without prejudice to allow for refiling in the proper Court. See York Holdings, Ltd. v. Waid, 345 F.R.D. 626, 627 (D. Nev. 2024) ("When a subpoena-related motion has been filed in the wrong District, courts routinely deny that motion without prejudice to refiling it in the proper tribunal."); see also Sacks, No. 1:23CV1058, 2024 WL 3535390, at *3 (collecting cases). Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 08/21/2024.(aet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/20 2:41 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.(BUSSEY, RAFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension
33 33 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 08/20 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MICHAEL DAVIS TURNER on behalf of Plaintiff PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3896863.) (TURNER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Fri 08/09 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. JASON W. BURGESS is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney NEIL W. BLACKMON terminated. (BURGESS, JASON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
31 31 misc Certificate-Other Thu 08/01 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE re30 Memorandum, Defendant's Certification of Word Count by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
30 30 11 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 08/01 11:01 AM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim filed by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Certificate-Other Thu 08/01 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim Defendant's Certification of Word Count by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Thu 08/01 10:55 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 8/22/2024 (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 08/01 9:40 AM
Motions Referred: RE:25 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Response of Precision Claim Consultants , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (rw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 07/31 12:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2024 (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/17 3:26 PM
Reset Response Deadline re25 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Response of Precision Claim Consultants . Response to Motion due by 7/30/2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
26 26 misc Certificate-Other Tue 07/16 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service of Motion to Compel to Precision Claim Consultants, LLC by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Compel Tue 07/16 2:44 PM
MOTION to Compel Subpoena Response of Precision Claim Consultants by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2024(BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel
24 24 misc Certificate-Other Tue 07/16 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Meet and Confer Regarding Non-Compliance with Subpoena by Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Rescheduling Thu 06/27 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Rescheduling: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3 before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. *Counsel will be notified of a date certain for trial closer to the start of the term. A settlement conference in the above-referenced case will be set for a date approximately 30 days before the commencement of the calendar term. Counsel are directed to bring their clients and a representative from the corporations to the settlement conference.The parties shall comply in all respects with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) regarding final pretrial disclosure, including the time requirements set out therein. Unless the court orders otherwise, pretrial disclosures must be made no later than April 4, 2025. Motions in limine must be filed no later than April 11, 2025. Any objections to pretrial disclosures and responses to motions in limine must be served and promptly filed no later than April 18, 2025. Each party shall file a trial brief, along with proposed instructions on the issues no later than April 14, 2025. Counsel shall consult and endeavor to file one (1) set of agreed upon jury instructions to the extent practicable and may file competing jury instructions where there is disagreement. An electronic Word version of the jury instructions shall be emailed to the assigned district judges ECF mailbox. *Trial will be moved to the March term it no dispositive motions are filed.(rw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Wed 05/15 1:52 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/27 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney NEIL W. BLACKMON on behalf of Defendant QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (BLACKMON, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/19 10:40 AM
Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
order Order Mon 03/18 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER issued by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 3/18/24. Upon review of the docket and in light of the long period for discovery, the Court requires a status report from counsel. Given the lengthy discovery period authorized, the Court does not contemplate any extensions, see generally Doc. 8 paragraph 9, and it wants to be sure the parties are diligently and actively moving the case forward. Counsel shall confer and no later than May 15, 2024, SHALL file a Joint Status Report detailing the status of written discovery, document production, steps taken to overcome any challenges, depositions taken and scheduled, and plan for completing remaining discovery by November 1, 2024.(rw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
20 20 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/23 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. of Plaintiff's Responses to Discovery Requests (HUGGINS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/22 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/7/2025 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3 before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. A settlement conference in the above-referenced case will be set for a date approximately 30 days before the commencement of the calendar term. Counsel are directed to bring their clients and a representative from the corporations to the settlement conference.The parties shall comply in all respects with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) regarding final pretrial disclosure, including the time requirements set out therein. Unless the court orders otherwise, pretrial disclosures must be made no later than March 7, 2025. Motions in limine must be filed no later than March 14, 2025. Any objections to pretrial disclosures and responses to motions in limine must be served and promptly filed no later than March 21, 2025. Each party shall file a trial brief, along with proposed instructions on the issues no later than March 17, 2025. Counsel shall consult and endeavor to file one (1) set of agreed upon jury instructions to the extent practicable and may file competing jury instructions where there is disagreement. An electronic Word version of the jury instructions shall be emailed to the assigned district judges ECF mailbox. (rw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 11/21 10:38 AM
ORDER Appointing SCOTT C. HART, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (mb)
Related: [-]
order Mediation Scheduling Order Tue 11/21 10:36 AM
MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 11/1/2024. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
17 17 order Rule 26f - Joint Mon 11/20 4:38 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/20/2023; The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry15 ) submitted by the parties and approves it with the modifications set out herein. Discovery is standard. Discovery due by 11/1/2024. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2024. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2024. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 5/1/2024. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 5/1/2024.The Parties agree that the mediator shall be Scott Hart. The Parties have discussed special procedures for managing this case, including reference of the case to a Magistrate Judge on consent of the Parties under 28 U.S.C. §§636(c), or appointment of a master. To date, no special procedures have been deemed necessary by the parties. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately seven (7) days. A jury trial has been demanded by both parties. (sh)
Related: [-]
notice Working Copies Notice Mon 11/20 4:38 PM
NOTICE to Counsel: Counsel shall comply with the assigned magistrate judge's working copies preference for filing non-dispositive motions and briefs including discovery matters as seen at https://www.ncmd.uscourts.gov/sites/ncmd/files/JudPref.pdf. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 11/14 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JEFFREY REMINGTON HUGGINS on behalf of Plaintiff PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3698077.) (HUGGINS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 11/14 10:09 AM
Motions Referred: RE:15 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (kg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 motion Rule 26f Report - Joint Mon 11/13 5:49 PM
Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION.(WATSON, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
14 14 notice Notice - Other Fri 11/10 10:01 AM
NOTICE by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. of Special Appearance (HUGGINS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
13 13 notice Notice - Other Wed 11/08 1:46 PM
NOTICE by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. of Special Appearance (HUGGINS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Special Appearance Thu 11/02 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RAFORD W. BUSSEY, JR on behalf of Plaintiff PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3689737.) (BUSSEY, RAFORD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 motion Continue Fri 10/13 11:52 AM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION.(WATSON, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Fri 10/13 12:46 PM
Motions Referred: RE:11 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 10/13 2:44 PM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Consent Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference. For good cause shown, the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing shall be continued to Tuesday, November 21, 2023. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/13/2023.(Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/13 3:39 PM
Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 11/21/2023 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Fri 09/08 3:52 PM
Envelope Containing5 ECF 30 Day Notice addressed to RAFORD W. BUSSEY, JR. P.O. BOX 1804, GREENVILLE, SC 29602 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Return to Sender, Attempted- Unknown, Unable to Forward. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Wed 09/06 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/18/2023 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Wed 09/06 8:20 AM
STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 11:03 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (WATSON, LEWIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Right to Consent Wed 08/23 11:13 AM
Notice of Right to Consent. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
utility Case Assigned Wed 08/23 11:11 AM
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 08/23 11:12 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
5 5 misc ECF 30 Day Notice Tue 08/22 9:33 AM
ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney RAFORD W. BUSSEY, JR. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 9/21/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Reissued Tue 08/22 9:04 AM
Summons Reissued as to QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (State Court document originally filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case number 23cvs376, issued on 07/5/2023, listed as Exhibit 2 to the1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/22 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION. (State Court document originally filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case number 23cvs376, issued on 04/10/2023, listed as # 8 to the1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 08/21 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Trial Demanded against QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION, filed by PRESQUE ISLE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (State Court document originally filed in Orange County Superior Court, case number 23cvs376, listed as Exhibit 1 to the1 Petition for Removal)(Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Removal Mon 08/21 5:04 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 23cvs376 against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3635448.), filed by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION.(WATSON, LEWIS) Modified on 8/21/2023 to add State court information (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- A&P Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - DOI Letter dated July 21, 2023,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Policy,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal