California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 5:23-cv-01694
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 2:09 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
July and Rippa LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Pearce
Socal Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Good Shepherd Ministries International
Represented By
J. Mark Holland
J. Mark Holland And Associates Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 05, 2024
23 23 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Fri 01/05 2:32 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
22 22 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/05 2:24 PM
Order Granting Stipulation for Dismissal of Case with Prejudice21 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court orders this case dismissed with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). It is further ORDERED that each party will be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
21 21 stip Dismiss Case Wed 01/03 4:34 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant July and Rippa LLC.(Pearce, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
20 20 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 12/20 2:16 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to Ex-tend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By More than 30 days),19 , by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Upon consideration of the parties stipulation, the Court extends the deadline for Defendant July & Rippa LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint from December 19, 2023 to January 2, 2024. (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 12/19 3:28 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 2, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant July and Rippa LLC.(Pearce, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
18 18 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/05 2:02 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Defendant July & Rippa LLC 's Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint from December 4, 2023 to December 19, 202317 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 12/04 3:17 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 19, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant July and Rippa LLC.(Attorney Jonathan Pearce added to party July and Rippa LLC(pty:dft))(Pearce, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 17, 2023
16 16 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Fri 11/17 5:15 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,15 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Pursuant to Rule 8-3, "If the stipulation, together with any prior stipulations, does not extend the time for more than a cumulative total of thirty (30) days from the date the response initially would have been due, the stipulation need not be approved by the judge." In view of this, a proposed order is not necessary. The deadline to respond to the initial complaint is therefore extended to December 4, 2023, as stated in the stipulation. (iva)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 11/17 5:11 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 12/4/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation and Order, located under: Civil Events > Court Events > Orders (Non-Motion). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:52 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed,13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service Documents - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaint - select - Service of Summons and Complaint returned executed 21 days. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Mon 11/13 1:39 PM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Good Shepherd Ministries International, upon Defendant All Defendants. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Andrew Swatzell, None. (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 3 pgs motion Extend Time to File Answer Fri 11/03 2:41 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 12/4/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Good Shepherd Ministries International. (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
11 11 22 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 08/30 10:25 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
10 10 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/23 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Good Shepherd Ministries International, (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/23 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/23 1:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant July and Rippa LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/23 12:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/23 12:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/23 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
4 4 2 pgs notice Summons Request Mon 08/21 4:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff GOOD SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL. (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 08/21 4:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GOOD SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL. (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 08/21 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GOOD SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL. (Holland, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/21 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35895832 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff GOOD SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL. (Attorney J. Mark Holland added to party GOOD SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla))(Holland, J.)
Related: [-]