California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:23-cv-01654
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Terminated:Aug 21, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 12:28 AM PST
Defendant
Richard R. Mann
4901 Green River Road No 123
Corona, CA 92878
Plaintiff
NewRez LLC
Represented By
Kelli Madeleine Brown
Ghadotti Berger LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 08/22 12:07 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of the State of CA Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of the State of CA Riverside. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/22 11:38 AM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: denying2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attachment. (See document for further details) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 08/21 9:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/21 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Mon 08/21 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-1654 JAK-SP. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 08/21 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Richard R. Mann. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/21 9:29 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by defendant Richard R. Mann. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 08/21 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court State of CA County of Riverside, case number CVRI2303643 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and NON CONFORM copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by defendant Richard R. Mann. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71