Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:23-cv-03941
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
United National Insurance Company
Represented By
Sidney W. Degan, III
Degan Blanchard & Nash
contact info
James A. Rowell
Degan, Blanchard & Nash (new Orleans)
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Willie Jenkins
Represented By
Carla Ruth Delpit
Daly & Black, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Hurd
Daly & Black, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 05/09 1:52 PM
ORDER granting26 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The above-captioned matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on May 9, 2025. (mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/02 10:17 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Willie Jenkins.(Delpit, Carla) Modified on 5/2/2025 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 8:56 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a supplemental status report no later than April 25, 2025, briefing the Court as to the status of the case and the outcome of the previously scheduled mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on March 24, 2025.(mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
24 24 21 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 11:49 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/20 9:10 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDERED that defendant/insurers, through counsel, immediately determine whether any of their settled Hurricane Ida cases remain on the docket of this Court and immediately file a Notice of Settlement in said case so that it can be dismissed by the District Judge. This process shall be completed in no more than 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/18/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 09/03 1:54 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by United National Insurance Company (Rowell, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/23 4:25 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than September 6, 2024, briefing the Court as to the current status of the case and what progress has been made in Streamline Settlement Program. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on August 23, 2024.(mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 07/25 4:41 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. Carla Ruth Delpit is hereby enrolled as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Aaron J. Hurd is withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on July 25, 2024. (mp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 07/24 3:19 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carla R. Delpit to be substituted in place of Aaron J. Hurd by Willie Jenkins.(Hurd, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 10:38 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
17 17 30+ pgs order Order Fri 12/15 2:05 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/14 8:32 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carla Ruth Delpit. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 13, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys
Friday, November 10, 2023
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/10 3:53 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10267198) by Willie Jenkins.(Hurd, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Letter in Support of Carla Delpit
Friday, October 06, 2023
14 14 misc ADI event Fri 10/06 2:50 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 10/05 9:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Penn-Patriot Insurance Company, Corporate Parent GBLI Holdings llc for United National Insurance Company (Rowell, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/03 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by United National Insurance Company.(Rowell, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/29 4:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; United National Insurance Company served on 8/28/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Hurd, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/28 4:26 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 30+ pgs order Order Tue 09/19 2:14 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/15 8:18 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to United National Insurance Company. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 14, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 09/13 4:08 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Document's signature line is blank. All future documents must reflect either an original signature or an electronic signature of the filing attorney following the format 's/ (attorney name)'. No further action is necessary. (mp)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/13 3:59 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by United National Insurance Company.Attorney James A. Rowell added to party United National Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rowell, James) Modified text on 9/13/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Tue 08/22 1:00 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(mp)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/22 1:00 PM
Summons Issued as to United National Insurance Company. (mp)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 08/22 9:53 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Counsel Tue 08/22 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATION Letter by Aaron Hurd certifying Plaintiff is a former client of MMA. . (Hurd, Aaron) Modified text on 8/22/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/22 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against United National Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10098702) filed by Willie Jenkins.Attorney Aaron Hurd added to party Willie Jenkins(pty:pla).(Hurd, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons