Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Referred: Ryon M Mccabe
Case #: 9:23-cv-81171
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Nicholas Lordi
Represented By
Don Stephens
Olds & Stephens
contact info
Defendant
West Palm Beach Police Department
Represented By
Victoria Leonora Olds
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Jamesloo Charles
Represented By
Lyman Hawley Reynolds, Jr.
Roberts Reynolds Bedard & Tuzzio
contact info
Defendant
City of West Palm Beach
401 Clematis Street
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Victoria Leonora Olds
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
John Monroque
500 N Federal Highway Suite 200
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Fan Li
contact info
Sean Henryk Parys
Kelley Uustal
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
78 78 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 01/28 1:54 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) As such, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, effective January 27, 2025, the date on which the parties filed their Stipulation of Dismissal [ECF No. 77]. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
77 77 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 01/27 1:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by John Monroque(Uustal, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Defendants
Sunday, January 26, 2025
76 76 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Sun 01/26 4:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court takes note of75 the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, which asks the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction of the parties' settlement agreement and adheres to the general principle that settlement agreements are a matter of private contract between the parties. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1281 (11th Cir. 2012). The Court therefore deems the Joint Stipulation ineffective. On or before January 31, 2025 , the parties shall file a renewed Stipulation in accordance with this Order or a Joint Memorandum, attaching the Settlement Agreement, and explaining in detail why the Court should retain jurisdiction in this particular case. Alternatively, the parties may file a stipulation of dismissal that does not seek the retention of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/26/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
75 75 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 01/24 4:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by John Monroque(Uustal, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Defendants