Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:23-bk-13376

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:23-ap-01164
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Labrador
144 SE Village Dr
Port Saint Lucie, FL 34952
Represented By
John Labrador
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Labrador
1806 N. Flamingo Road Ste 300
Pembroke Pines, FL 33028
Represented By
Mark S. Roher, Esq.
Law Office Of Mark S. Roher, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/09 1:47 PM
Adversary Case 9:23-ap-1164 Closed. Complaint Dismissed as Settled. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 10/07 2:52 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador. (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
24 24 court Notice of Continued Hearing in Open Court [TEXT ONLY] Wed 07/31 11:34 AM
Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 7/24/24 @ 10:00 am . This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/09/2024 at 10:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 17 Verified Motion for Default Final Judgment Against John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2024-to edit text . filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
23 23 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Tue 07/02 10:24 AM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Defendant John Labrador Related [+]. (Lefko, Justin)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Filing
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/02 10:21 AM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy , Filed by Defendant John Labrador. (Lefko, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/02 9:38 AM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy , Filed by Defendant John Labrador. (Lefko, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
20 20 court Notice of Continued Hearing in Open Court [TEXT ONLY] Wed 06/05 12:35 PM
Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 6/5/24 @ 10:00 am. This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 07/24/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. Although the Court will conduct the hearing in person, any interested party may choose to attend the hearing remotely via Zoom.[LINK:To register, click on the link on the Court's webpage.] (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 17 Verified Motion for Default Final Judgment Against John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2024-to edit text . filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
19 19 court Notice of Continued Hearing in Open Court [TEXT ONLY] Wed 05/29 11:50 AM
Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 5/29/24 @ 10:00 am. This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 10:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. Although the Court will conduct the hearing in person, any interested party may choose to attend the hearing remotely via Zoom.[LINK:To register, click on the link on the Court's webpage.] (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 17 Verified Motion for Default Final Judgment Against John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2024-to edit text . filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
18 18 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 05/15 8:36 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 17 Verified Motion for Default Final Judgment Against John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2024-to edit text . filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
17 17 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/14 8:22 AM
Verified Motion for Default Final Judgment Against John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2024-to edit text (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
16 16 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 04/16 3:30 PM
Status Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/15 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant John Labrador (Re:5 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador)
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/12 9:30 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant John Labrador Related [+] (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Saturday, December 09, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/10 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Conditionally Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Clerk's Default. Defendant John Labrador shall file an answer to the Complaint [ECF No. 1] on or before December 10, 2023. If Defendant fails to timely file an answer to the Complaint, the Clerk is directed to enter a default forthwith. ### (Re: 5 Motion for Default filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador). (Eisenberg, Randy)
Thursday, December 07, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/07 12:45 PM
Order Conditionally Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Clerk's Default. Defendant John Labrador shall file an answer to the Complaint [ECF No. 1] on or before December 10, 2023. If Defendant fails to timely file an answer to the Complaint, the Clerk is directed to enter a default forthwith. ### Related [+]. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Saturday, December 02, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/03 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador). Pretrial Conference set for 02/07/2024 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Thu 11/30 1:21 PM
Amended Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 02/07/2024 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/23 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador). Pretrial Conference set for 01/10/2024 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Monday, November 20, 2023
8 8 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Mon 11/20 1:38 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 01/10/2024 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Sunday, November 19, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Mon 11/20 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 11/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing (Re:5 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador) Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401.
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 11/17 4:08 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
5 5 motion Default Wed 11/15 10:28 AM
Motion for Default Against Defendant John Labrador Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/12 7:42 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador Related [+]. (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 08/22 12:09 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 08/22 12:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on John Labrador Answer Due 9/21/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 11/15/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01164 Complaint by Danielle Labrador against John Labrador. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Danielle Labrador
Monday, August 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/21 6:21 PM
Adversary case 23-01164 Complaint by Danielle Labrador against John Labrador. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-]