Minnesota District Court
Judge:Eric C Tostrud
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:23-cv-02568
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 2:54 AM CST
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By
Elizabeth G. Doolin
Chittenden Murday & Novotny
contact info
Julie F Wall
Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Pasinsky
Represented By
Zachary Schmoll
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Serena E Seashore
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/18 6:20 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/18/2024.(RMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
24 24 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 09/17 10:56 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re23 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Karrer, Brenna)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/17 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sean Pasinsky. (Karrer, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Wed 08/14 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Sean Pasinsky. (Karrer, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
21 21 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Thu 08/01 1:59 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: All deadlines in this case are VACATED due to the parties settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/1/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 08/01 1:18 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/1/2024: Settlement Conference - Confidential Settlement Reached. Digital Recording Video Conference Time: 9:00 a.m. - 12:48 p.m. Total Time: 3 hours 48 minutes SEALED Time: 12:48-12:55 p.m. Total SEALED Time: 8 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Serena Seashore For Defendant(s): Aimee Clare PROCEEDINGS: Terms stated on the record. Any transcript or copy of the audio file of the terms of settlement is CONFIDENTIAL and shall be SEALED. Access restricted to the parties and their counsel. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
19 19 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Thu 07/11 12:54 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/25/2024. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/18/2024. Settlement Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/11/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/11 9:58 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Aimee Clare for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/11/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/10 11:32 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aimee I. Clare. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10966155 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wall, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/12 4:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 3/15/2024. Motions (disp) due by 8/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/12/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 12/04 10:15 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Sean Pasinsky.(Doolin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
14 14 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 10/27 1:00 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 11/27/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/27/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
13 13 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 10/25 12:49 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Doolin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/25 12:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Doolin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/20 12:36 PM
ORDER on8 Stipulation. Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company shall have until and including October 30, 2023, to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/20/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/19 5:20 PM
ORDER on8 Stipulation. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company response due 10/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/19/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
9 9 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 10/18 9:34 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 Stipulation. (Doolin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 10/18 9:29 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Sean Pasinsky. (Doolin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/03 8:09 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth G. Doolin for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/3/2023. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/02 1:03 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth G. Doolin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10571481 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wall, Julie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie F Wall on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wall, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/01 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sean Pasinsky. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/22/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Seashore, Serena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/22 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 08/22 3:12 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2568 (ECT/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/22 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10486940) filed by Sean Pasinsky. Filer requests summons issued. (Seashore, Serena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet