Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kezia OL Taylor
Case #: 2:23-cv-01509
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:28 AM EST
Defendant
CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By
Korry Alden Greene
Cipriani & Werner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
COMFORT SUITES
Represented By
Korry Alden Greene
Cipriani & Werner, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JODY STEINBERGER
Represented By
Thomas B. Anderson
Bordas And Bordas
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN STEINBERGER
Represented By
Thomas B. Anderson
Bordas And Bordas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
47 47 1 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Thu 04/17 1:48 PM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 04/17/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Beaver on behalf of UNION HOSPITALITY. (Beaver, Samuel)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Kraus on behalf of UNION HOSPITALITY. (Kraus, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
44 44 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 12:37 PM
ANSWER to41 Amended Complaint, by UNION HOSPITALITY. (Falavolito, Dean)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
43 43 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Choice Hotels Objections, Answer and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogs and RFP by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
42 42 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 4:03 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to41 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/13 11:30 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., and UNION HOSPITALITY, INC., filed by JODY STEINBERGER, KAREN STEINBERGER. (Anderson, Thomas) Modified text on 2/13/2025 to add Defendants names. (jd)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 02/13 1:52 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. on 2/24/2025; UNION HOSPITALITY on 2/24/2025 (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
40 40 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Wed 02/12 5:28 PM
ORDER that the (ECF No.39 ) Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint attached to this motion no later than February 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 02/12/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Wed 02/12 10:26 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re39 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
39 39 motion Leave to File Amended Complaint Tue 02/11 12:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by JODY STEINBERGER, KAREN STEINBERGER. (Anderson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
38 38 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 02/11 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor: The Court held a Telephone Conference. The parties acknowledged that mediation was unsuccessful, as they remain significantly divided and continue to dispute the events surrounding August 8, 2023. To date, depositions have not been scheduled, and discovery requests remain outstanding. The parties will complete fact discovery by April 11, 2025, and do not anticipate the need for expert discovery. However, expert discovery may be discussed at the Post-Fact Discovery Conference on April 18, 2025. Plaintiff plans to file a motion for leave to amend the complaint to include a claim under the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act; Defendants do not oppose the motion. Defendants intend to file a motion for summary judgment on the negligence claim. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
37 37 adr Report of Mediation Tue 02/04 6:00 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 2/4/2025. Case has not been resolved. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI terminated. Attorney Sally G. Cimini terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 23, 2024
36 36 adr Notice of Mediation Sat 11/23 9:34 PM
Notice of Mediation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Mediation Date February 4, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
35 35 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/22 1:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(a)(1) by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION HOSPITALITY (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 11/14 2:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Cimini is appointed as mediator. Party SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 11/14/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
33 33 order Case Management Order Wed 11/13 7:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with provisions of Rule 16 shall be completed as follows: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be made by November 26, 2024. Amendments to the pleadings and joinder of additional parties will be completed by December 9, 2024. The ADR process will be completed no later than February 4, 2025. A telephone status conference is scheduled for February 11, 2025 at 10:00 AM. Counsel are to call into the conference by dialing (412) 547-0144 and entering the Phone Conference ID 192 447 550#. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. The parties shall complete fact discovery by April 11, 2025. A post discovery status conference will be held on April 18, 2025 at 11:00 AM. Trial counsel shall attend and the parties shall be available by telephone. No later than 5 business days prior to the conference any party intending to file a motion for summary judgment shall file a statement, no longer than 3 pages, setting forth the grounds on which the motion will be filed. All parties are to be prepared to discuss this at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 11/13/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
32 32 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Tue 11/12 4:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor: An Initial Case Management Conference was held on 11/12/2024. A case management order will be entered. (Court Reporter: None) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
31 31 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Fri 11/08 10:25 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JODY STEINBERGER, KAREN STEINBERGER, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION HOSPITALITY. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 11/08 10:09 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/14 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION HOSPITALITY. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
28 28 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/07 9:52 PM
ORDER that the Initial Case Management Conference in this matter will be held November 12, 2024, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor in Courtroom 7B of the Joseph F. Weis, Jr., U.S. Courthouse, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, at least seven (7) days prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties shall prepare and file a report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), the form of which is set forth in LCvR 16.1.A. in the Local Rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, at least three (3) business days prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties must also file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, which is attached to this order as Exhibit A. Counsel must familiarize themselves with the Practices and Procedures of the undersigned on the Court's website: https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Taylor_Practices_Procedures.pdfCounsel will be held responsible for complying with such practices and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 10/07/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/30 12:17 PM
ORDER that for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued on this date, it is hereby ORDERED that the (ECF No.9 ) Motion to Strike and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants are DENIED as to all claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 09/30/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
26 26 11 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 09/30 12:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION DENYING the9 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UNION HOSPITALITY, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 09/30/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/19 1:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by UNION HOSPITALITY. (Boyer, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
24 24 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 07/03 3:41 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by UNION HOSPITALITY. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 07/03 2:09 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Krofcheck on behalf of CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION HOSPITALITY. (Krofcheck, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Nicole Boyer on behalf of UNION HOSPITALITY. (Boyer, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dean F. Falavolito on behalf of UNION HOSPITALITY. (Falavolito, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Wed 05/22 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by William B. Pentecost, Jr on behalf of CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION HOSPITALITY. Attorney Korry Alden Greene terminated. (Pentecost, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
18 18 order Order Tue 04/30 5:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING the (ECF No.17 ) Corrected Joint Stipulation to Amend Caption. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the caption shall be amended to read: JODY AND KAREN STEINBERGER, Husband and Wife, v. CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. and UNION HOSPITALITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 04/30/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
STIPULATION to Amend Caption by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Thu 04/25 11:41 AM
STIPULATION to Amend Caption by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
15 15 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 03/22 2:23 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Thu 03/14 11:18 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JODY STEINBERGER. (Anderson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/11 5:39 PM
ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, the parties must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than April 1, 2024. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If any party elects to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 03/11/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
12 12 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/07 1:55 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re9 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike and motion to Dismiss filed by JODY STEINBERGER. (Anderson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Fri 01/19 5:50 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's counsel shall file a response to the ECF No.9 Motion to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f), Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and Demurrer no later than February 8, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any reply brief is due within seven days of the filing of the response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no surreplies are permitted without leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 01/19/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 01/18 3:39 PM
BRIEF in Support re9 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Strike Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/18 3:35 PM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/16 1:31 PM
AND NOW, this 16th day of January, 2024, upon consideration of ECF No.6 Defendants' Motion to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f), Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and Demurrer, wherein counsel has failed to include a Certificate of Conferral as required by this Court's Practices and Procedures, see II. Motions Practice, indicating that they met and conferred in an effort to resolve their disputes prior to filing the motion, the Motion to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f), Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and the ECF No.7 ] Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f), Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and Demurrer are all stricken for failure to comply. Further, the parties are reminded that they are to review and comply, in every particular, with this Court's Practices and Procedures when filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 01/16/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
7 7 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/12 7:19 PM
BRIEF in Support re6 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Strike Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/12 7:18 PM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 04, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/04 1:31 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by COMFORT SUITES, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Answer due from COMFORT SUITES on 1/12/2024; CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. on 1/12/2024. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/03 2:59 PM
This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor pursuant to Administrative Order 2:23-mc-1237. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/03 10:33 AM
This case has been reassigned to Judge David S. Cercone pursuant to Administrative Order 2:23-mc-1237. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/19 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Korry Alden Greene on behalf of CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES. (Greene, Korry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/19 9:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JODY STEINBERGER. CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 9/12/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Anderson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/23 6:39 PM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/23/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Tue 08/22 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., COMFORT SUITES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7844645), filed by JODY STEINBERGER, KAREN STEINBERGER. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet