New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 1:23-cv-07426
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331bc Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 4:15 AM EST
Plaintiff
Brian Blischak
13088 Sunset Point PL
San Diego, CA 92130
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Leonite Capital, LLC
Terminated: 02/12/2024
Represented By
Harvey D. Mervis
Hinman, Howard & Kattell, LLP
contact info
Albert John Millus, Jr.
Hinman, Howard & Kattell, LLP
contact info
Amy Shapiro
Hinman, Howard & Kattell
contact info
Defendant
Avi Geller
Terminated: 09/08/2023
Represented By
Albert John Millus, Jr.
Hinman, Howard & Kattell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shaul Kopelowitz
Terminated: 09/08/2023
Represented By
Harvey D. Mervis
Hinman, Howard & Kattell, LLP
contact info
Albert John Millus, Jr.
Hinman, Howard & Kattell, LLP
contact info
Amy Shapiro
Hinman, Howard & Kattell
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/06 2:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leonite Capital, LLC..(ta)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Wed 09/06 2:46 PM
Mailed a copy of6 Summons Issued to Brian Blischak 13088 Sunset Point PL San Diego, CA 92130. (ta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
misc Pro Se Payment of Fee - Processed Tue 08/29 11:48 AM
Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 8/29/23, Receipt Number 20419. (amf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/29 10:50 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Leonite Capital, LLC.Document filed by Brian Blischak. Related document:1 Complaint.(sc) (sc). (sc). Modified on 8/29/2023 (sc). Modified on 8/29/2023 (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/29/2023) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 (8/29/2023) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 (8/29/2023) Exhibit C,
Att: 4 (8/29/2023) Exhibit D,
Att: 5 (8/29/2023) Exhibit E,
Att: 6 (8/29/2023) Exhibit F,
Att: 7 (8/29/2023) Exhibit G,
Att: 8 (8/29/2023) Exhibit J
Att: 9 (8/29/2023) Exhibit K,
Att: 10 (8/29/2023) Exhibit L,
Att: 11 (8/29/2023) Exhibit N,
Att: 12 (8/29/2023) Exhibit Q,
Att: 13 (8/29/2023) Exhibit R,
Att: 14 (8/29/2023) Exhibit S,
Att: 15 (8/29/2023) Exhibit T,
Att: 16 (8/29/2023) Exhibit U,
Att: 17 (8/29/2023) Exhibit V,
Att: 18 (8/29/2023) Exhibit W,
Att: 19 (8/29/2023) Exhibit X,
Att: 20 (8/29/2023) Exhibit Y,
Att: 21 (8/29/2023) Exhibit List
Friday, August 18, 2023
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/22 4:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leonite Capital, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brian Blischak..(rdz)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/22 4:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 08/22 3:52 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Brian Blischak consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Brian Blischak..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/22 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Leonite Capital, LLC. Document filed by Brian Blischak..(rdz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 08/22 3:17 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]