Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christy Criswell Wiegand
Case #: 2:23-cv-01511
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:29 AM EST
Defendant
PITTSBURGH MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By
Alexa R Beining
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Robert W. Cameron
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Leech Tishman 525 William Penn Place 28th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
contact info
Plaintiff
KEISHA SHEALEY
Represented By
Ari R. Karpf
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Allison A Barker
Karpf, Karpf, & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
1200 REEDSDALE STREET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Terminated: 11/15/2023
Represented By
Anthony Cillo
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
contact info
Defendant
1200 REEDSDALE STREET, LP
Terminated: 11/15/2023
Represented By
Anthony Cillo
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 29 2025
OPINION re 42 Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant PITTSBURGH MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/29/2025. (bjw)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
73 73 order Order Fri 05/02 8:52 AM
ORDER that, in light of72 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/2/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
72 72 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 5:34 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by KEISHA SHEALEY. (Barker, Allison)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
71 71 order Status Report Order Mon 04/28 12:00 PM
ORDER re70 Status Report filed by KEISHA SHEALEY. In light of the70 Status Report, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT on or before 5/16/2025 the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report regarding settlement. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/28/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
70 70 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 4:58 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by KEISHA SHEALEY. (Barker, Allison)
Related: [-]