California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:23-cv-06925
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
Krendsoft LLC
Represented By
Brandon C. Roesler
Ls Carlson Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Emburse, Inc.
Represented By
John C Clough
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Devin Levy
Terminated: 11/01/2023
Defendant
Tulasi Vamsi Rachapudi
Terminated: 11/01/2023
Represented By
Brandon C. Roesler
Ls Carlson Law, PC
contact info
Defendant
Krishna Nadiminti
Terminated: 11/01/2023
Represented By
Brandon C. Roesler
Ls Carlson Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, November 10, 2023
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Fri 11/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) ONLY as to Krendsoft LLC. (Clough, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
13 13 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 11/01 5:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc., re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))12 As to Krishna Nadiminti served on November 1, 2023. (Clough, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 11/01 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Krishna Nadiminti. (Clough, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 11/01 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Tulasi Vamsi Rachapudi. (Clough, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 11/01 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Devin Levy. (Clough, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 10/03 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Declining to Enter Parties' Stipulated Proposed Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: re: Stipulation for Protective Order,8 . Accordingly, the Court declines to enter the October 2 proposed protective order. The parties may submit a revised such proposed order and stipulation, using the Court's template and varying from it only as necessary. [See document for further information.] (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 stip Protective Order Mon 10/02 4:34 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Krendsoft LLC, Krishna Nadiminti, Tulasi Vamsi Rachapudi.(Attorney Brandon C. Roesler added to party Krendsoft LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon C. Roesler added to party Krishna Nadiminti (pty:dft), Attorney Brandon C. Roesler added to party Tulasi Vamsi Rachapudi(pty:dft))(Roesler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 24, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/24 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/23 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Summons has been issued, however in the future please e-file the summons separately under the correct event which is located under Civil Events - Service Documents - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints and by selecting Summons Request. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/23 3:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Krendsoft LLC, Devin Levy, Krishna Nadiminti, Tulasi Vamsi Rachapudi. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/23 2:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/23 2:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/23 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/22 8:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35906584 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Emburse, Inc.. (Attorney John C Clough added to party Emburse, Inc.(pty:pla))(Clough, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons in a Civil Action