California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-04266
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 2:09 AM PST
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Caeli A. Higney
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Digital Will Inc.
Represented By
Gabriel G. Green
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Michael Jason Worth
Buchalter
contact info
Willmore Frederick Holbrow, III
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/15 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Digital Will Inc. (Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
16 16 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 11/09 10:34 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 11/09 9:28 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Higney, Caeli)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 10/20 6:16 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(A) AND FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(A) filed by Apple Inc.. (Higney, Caeli)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/12 12:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge P. Casey Pitts in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 09/11 4:32 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) and for Motion to Dismiss Briefing Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Higney, Caeli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/06 10:54 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for Discovery Purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 09/05 11:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/05 9:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Higney, Caeli)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/05 9:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caeli A. Higney for Apple Inc. (Higney, Caeli)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 03, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Sun 09/03 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Digital Will Inc. re1 Complaint (Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/22 1:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 08/22 1:35 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 08/22 11:34 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Digital Will Inc. (Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18568154.). Filed byDigital Will Inc..(Holbrow, Willmore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet