Original Case: 1:21-cv-03364

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01183
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Midvale Indemnity Company
Represented By
Robert James Cosgrove
Wade Clark Mulcahy
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London
Represented By
Dan David Kohane
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
M-Tek Development, LLC
Represented By
Dan David Kohane
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TF Decatur LLC
Represented By
Dan David Kohane
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Third-Party-Defendant
Arevalos Construction Corp.


Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 5:54 AM EDT
Friday, August 18, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Midvale Indemnity Company, FILED. [3559763] 23-1183 [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:40 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED
2 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/07/2023, RECEIVED.[3559767] 23-1183 [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:43 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Midvale Indemnity Company, district court receipt # ANYEDC17006039, FILED.[3559768] 23-1183 [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:43 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3559769] 23-1183 [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:43 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED