New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Referred: Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:23-cv-07456
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC
Represented By
Aron Zwi Karabel
Holland & Knight
contact info
Derek W. Edwards
Holland & Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Wahab
Represented By
PeterPaul Elhamy Shaker
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/22 2:20 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Angela Wahab. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/22 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney PeterPaul Shaker. RE-FILE Document No. 26 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/21 5:11 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Angela Wahab. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 03/18 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/17/2024.(rpr)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 03/18 4:29 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT & ORDER: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, including the previous order referring the case to the Magistrate Judge for general pretrial supervision. See Dkt. No. 16. All orders, deadlines, and dates issued by Magistrate Judge Parker likewise remain in effect, and applications related to those deadlines should continue to be directed to Magistrate Judge Parker. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules & Practices ("Individual Rules"), which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-margaret-m-garnett. Parties are directed to Rule II(B)(9) of the Individual Rules regarding the conduct of the case following the close of fact discovery. Additionally, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall appear for a post- discovery conference with the Court on Wednesday, August 14, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held before Judge Garnett in Courtroom 906 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 Status Conference set for 8/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 3/11/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 03/07 6:37 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
24 24 order Mediation Referral Order Mon 02/12 3:45 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties shall participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. It is further ORDERED that, upon the conclusion of mediation, the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF informing the Court as to whether this case was resolved. If the case is not resolved, the parties' letter shall also provide an update as to the status of discovery. SO ORDERED. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/26/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/12/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Fri 02/09 2:59 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Plaintiff dated February 9, 2024 re: Status of the Case. Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
22 22 order Case Management Plan Thu 01/11 9:18 AM
ORDER: On January 10, 2024, the parties appeared for an Initial Case Management Conference. After review of the pleadings and consultation with the parties, the following Scheduling Order is entered pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: Pleadings, Parties, and Motions. The parties shall have until January 25, 2024 to amend the pleadings and join parties. No further amendments or joinder of parties thereafter absent good cause. Discovery. The deadline to complete all discovery is July 18, 2024. Initial requests for production are due by February 9, 2024, with responses due by March 10, 2024. Initial interrogatories and requests for admission must be exchanged by April 17, 2024. Depositions must be completed by July 18, 2024, and are limited to 2 per party. Discovery Disputes. The parties shall follow the Court's Individual Procedures with respect to any discovery disputes. See https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-katharine-h-parker. Rule 1 and Rule 26(b)(1). Counsel shall comply with Rule 1 and Rule 26(b)(1) in the conduct of discovery. Document Requests. Counsel shall be fully familiar with their obligations under Rules 34 and 26(g) and consider and discuss ways to ensure compliance and minimize disputes regarding overbreadth and specificity of requests and responses. A failure to comply with this responsibility carries serious consequences. Requests for any and all documents on a broad topic are presumptively improper. Likewise, courts have held that an objection that does not appropriately explain its grounds is forfeited. See, e.g., Fischer v. Forrest, 2017 WL 773694 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 28, 2017) ("[A]ny discovery response that does not comply with Rule 34's requirement to state objections with specificity (and to clearly indicate whether responsive material is being withheld on the basis of objection) will be deemed a waiver of all objections (except as to privilege)."). Status Letter. The parties shall submit a joint status letter on Friday, February 9, 2024 providing an update on the status of discovery and stating whether the parties would like the Court to schedule a settlement conference or refer the case to the Court-annexed mediation program. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2024. Deposition due by 7/18/2024. Discovery due by 7/18/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/10/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Case Management Conference Discovery Hearing Scheduling Conference Status Conference Wed 01/10 2:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference / Case Management / Discovery / Scheduling / Status - held on 1/10/2024 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. AT&T Conference Line (ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/09 6:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the telephonic Case Management Conference scheduled on Wednesday, January 10, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Please dial (866) 434-5269, access code: 4858267 re:20 Order (ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
20 20 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 12/05 11:41 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion to Continue. APPLICATION GRANTED: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 2:45 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby converted to telephonic and rescheduled to Wednesday, January 10, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Please dial (866) 434-5269, access code: 4858267. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/5/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
19 19 motion Continue Mon 12/04 10:32 PM
LETTER MOTION to Continue motion to reschedule initial case management conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Aron Z. Karabel dated December 4, 2023. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Edwards, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
18 18 discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Tue 11/28 4:43 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 11/16 4:25 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/16/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/16 3:51 PM
ORDER: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/16/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/16 2:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Edwards, Derek)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/16 2:31 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate JP Intermediate B, LLC, Other Affiliate NSA Incentive Plus, Inc. for The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Edwards, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/26 12:59 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Derek Edwards dated 10/26/2023.,1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC answer due 11/16/2023. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/26/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/26 10:45 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Derek Edwards dated 10/26/2023. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Edwards, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 11:49 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Derek W Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/18/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 3:55 PM
MOTION for Derek W Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28438370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Edwards, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit Derek Edwards Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A Certificate of Good Standing TN Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B Certificate of Good Standing CA Affidavit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Edwards
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 10/17 9:08 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Derek W Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28438370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/26 3:02 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,5 Summons Returned Executed addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Aron Karabel dated September 26 2023.,1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC answer due 10/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/26/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/26 1:08 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,5 Summons Returned Executed addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Aron Karabel dated September 26 2023. Document filed by The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aron Zwi Karabel on behalf of The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/07 3:07 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/07 3:01 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 08/24 1:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/24 10:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 08/24 10:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/24 10:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/23 11:44 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE JUICE PLUS+ COMPANY, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/23 11:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/23 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT against The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28186362)Document filed by Angela Wahab..(Shaker, PeterPaul)
Related: [-]