Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-40070

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:23-ap-01070
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.
Represented By
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.
contact info
Defendant
Tower Group Inc.
Represented By
Tower Group Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Morant Insurance Agency
Represented By
Morant Insurance Agency
contact info
Defendant
Affiliated Adjustment Group, Ltd.
3000 Marcus Avenue Suite #3W3
Lake Success, NY 11042
Represented By
Affiliated Adjustment Group, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Assurant Property Advantage
Represented By
Assurant Property Advantage
contact info
Defendant
Assurant Specialty Property
Represented By
Assurant Specialty Property
contact info
Defendant
MSW Adjustment Group
Represented By
MSW Adjustment Group
contact info
Defendant
DG Customs Built Homes & Remodeling
Represented By
DG Customs Built Homes & Remodeling
contact info
Plaintiff
Hyacinth Joyce Simms
1478 Flatbush Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11210
Represented By
Karamvir Dahiya
Dahiya Law Offices LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
71 71 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/12 10:43 AM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Hyacinth Joyce Simms. (Duffy, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
70 70 order Approving Stipulation Fri 05/09 3:51 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Approving a Global Settlement Between the Debtor and Defendants and (B) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 5/9/2025. (rom)
Related: [-] 69
Att: 1 Exhibit