California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 5:23-cv-01705
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of CA, San Bernardino County, CIVSB2309691
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 12:18 AM PST
Defendant
Exact Staff, Inc.
Represented By
Emma Rene Horner
Gordon And Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Target Corporation
Represented By
Julie A Dunne
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Matthew Bryan Riley
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria B. Alonso
Represented By
Jeffrey D Klein
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
Joshua Shirian
Bibiyan Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Ariella Mehrzadi
Bibiyan Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Brian Zaghi
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
David D Bibiyan
Bibiyan Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/10 5:24 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
19 19 stip Dismiss Case Fri 10/06 3:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Maria B. Alonso.(Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Thursday, October 05, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/05 10:57 AM
Order to Show Cause (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/12/2023. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 09/26 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO DISMISS CLASS CLAIMS AND REMAND16 . The parties stipulate to dismiss Plaintiff's class claims without prejudice, and remand "Plaintiff's remaining individual claims... to the San Bernardino County Superior Court." The stipulation is DENIED. This Order does not preclude the parties from stipulating to dismiss this action in its entirety without prejudice to refiling it in the San Bernardino County Superior Court. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
16 16 stip Remand Case to State Court Fri 09/15 2:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Maria B. Alonso.(Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING CLASS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT
Friday, September 01, 2023
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 09/01 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Exact Staff, Inc., (Horner, Emma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 08/30 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Zaghi counsel for Plaintiff Maria B. Alonso. Adding Brian Zaghi as counsel of record for Maria B. Alonso for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maria B. Alonso. (Attorney Brian Zaghi added to party Maria B. Alonso(pty:pla))(Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Related Case(s) Wed 08/30 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Target Corporation. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): San Bernardino County Superior Court, Case No. CIVSB2315705; San Bernardino County Superior Court, Case No. JCCP 5259; and 5:22-cv-00805-JGB (SHK). (Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
12 12 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 08/29 3:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFSCOMPLAINT TO SEPTEMBER 20, 202311 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 08/28 3:18 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Target Corporation answer now due 9/20/2023; Exact Staff, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2023, filed by defendant Target Corporation.(Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Mon 08/28 1:40 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge James V. Selna, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:17-cv-02342 JVS(SPx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 08/28 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emma Rene Horner counsel for Defendant Exact Staff, Inc.. Adding Emma R. Horner as counsel of record for Defendant EXACT STAFF, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EXACT STAFF, INC.. (Attorney Emma Rene Horner added to party Exact Staff, Inc.(pty:dft))(Horner, Emma)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 08/25 3:23 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 08/25 12:15 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/25 12:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Fri 08/25 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01705 MCS (SSCx). (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
4 4 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 08/23 11:07 AM
Proof of Service filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation re: Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 (Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/23 11:01 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation (Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/23 11:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation. (Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/23 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2309691 Receipt No: ACACDC-35908953 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation. (Attorney Matthew Bryan Riley added to party Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation(pty:dft))(Riley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Declaration of Riley
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 08/25 12:22 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Exact Staff, Inc., Target Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Maria B. Alonso. Filed in State Court on 4/27/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]