Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:23-cv-03267
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Terminated:Dec 28, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC
1403 South Christopher Columbus Blvd
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Conner H Porterfield
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick LLC
contact info
ADAM R. LONG
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RASHEENA BURNS
2010 Stenton Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19138
Represented By
BRIANA LYNN PEARSON
Law Offices Of Eric A. Shore
contact info
MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY
Law Offices Of Eric A Shore PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, December 28, 2023
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/28 11:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC. (LONG, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/05 4:29 PM
NOTICE: A settlement conference via the internet will be held on April 11, 2024 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Please email all participants names and emails to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov by April 2, 2024. The ZOOM log-on information will be emailed prior to the conference. A status telephone call will be held on April 2, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel will call chambers call-in number which was provided via e-mail.Please complete the attached summary and e-mail it to Chambers at sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov on or before April 2, 2024. If it is NOT emailed by then Judge Lloret may CANCEL the settlement conference.(smcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Mon 11/20 4:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/28/24. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 4/24/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/23. 11/20/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Mon 11/20 4:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 11/20/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Conner H Porterfield on behalf of GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC (Porterfield, Conner)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 discov Discovery Plan Wed 11/15 4:36 PM
Discovery Plan by RASHEENA BURNS.(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/07 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIANA LYNN PEARSON on behalf of RASHEENA BURNS with Certificate of Service(PEARSON, BRIANA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/01 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/20/2023 03:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE.(amw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER,
Att: 2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/26 3:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC.(LONG, ADAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 10/26 3:12 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC.(LONG, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/29 12:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RASHEENA BURNS. GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC waiver sent on 8/28/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/24 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/24/23 (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 08/23 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16896173.), filed by RASHEENA BURNS.(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit