North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:23-cv-00533
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 3:35 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Christy Le JL Corporation
Represented By
Matthew R Frontz
contact info
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Clement Asante
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Christy Le
Represented By
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Represented By
Sean Thomas Placey
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
James K. Sakaguchi
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Richard A Coughlin
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Neal M. Cohen
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Christy Le JL Corporation
Represented By
Matthew R Frontz
contact info
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Clement Asante
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Christy Le
Represented By
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Christy Le
Represented By
Matthew R Frontz
contact info
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Clement Asante
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Christy Le JL Corporation
Represented By
Matthew R Frontz
contact info
Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Polsinelli PC
contact info
LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Clement Asante
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Represented By
Sean Thomas Placey
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
James K. Sakaguchi
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Richard A Coughlin
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Neal M. Cohen
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 26, 2024
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/26 6:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 07/05 8:00 AM
ORDER granting with modification parties' 38 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. This matter is STAYED until July 26, 2024. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before July 26, 2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/3/24. (mga) (Main Document 39 replaced on 7/5/2024) (mga). NEF regenerated on 7/5/2024 (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/03 4:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Stay for 30 Days by Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le. Responses due by 7/17/2024 (Snipes, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 06/06 12:17 PM
ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. This matter is STAYED until July 5,2024. The parties shall file Stipulation of Dismissal on or before July 5, 2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/6/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 06/06 12:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Settlement Deadline 7/5/2024. Stayed End Deadline 7/5/2024. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
36 36 motion Stay Wed 06/05 6:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Christy Le JL Corporation. Responses due by 6/20/2024 (Snipes, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/04 2:42 PM
ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Adopt Claim Construction Order and to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/3/24. (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/17 4:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Adopt Claim Construction Order and to Amend Scheduling Order by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2024 (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-TSPA Markman Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
33 33 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 12/20 2:12 PM
ORDER denying 28 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/20/23. (clc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
32 32 order Patent Claim Construction Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 3:42 PM
Patent Claim Construction Scheduling Order. Opening Claim Construction Brief due by 6/30/2024. Responsive Claim Construction Brief due by 7/15/2024. Reply Claim Construction Brief due by 7/22/2024. Surreply Claim Construction Brief due by 7/29/2024. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/7/23. (clc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
31 31 respoth Reply to Response Mon 11/27 6:30 PM
REPLY to Response re30 Response in Opposition to Motion Defendants Christy Le JL Corp. d/b/a US Nails and Christy Le's Reply in Support of Their Opposed Motion to Stay the Current Proceedings by Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/20 7:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Stay the Current Proceedings by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2023 (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
29 29 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 11/14 2:43 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
28 28 motion Stay Mon 11/06 9:05 PM
MOTION to Stay the Current Proceedings by Christy Le JL Corporation. Responses due by 11/20/2023 (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opening Brief in Support of Their Opposed Motion to Stay the Current Proceedings,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Thursday, October 26, 2023
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/26 4:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Answer to First Amended Counterclaims) by Contego Spa Designs, Inc..(Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
26 26 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 10/12 6:25 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Original 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Christy Le, Christy Le JL Corporation by Christy Le, Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/06 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clement Asante on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le (Asante, Clement)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LaTasha Mabry Snipes on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation, Christy Le (Snipes, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw Thu 10/05 1:29 PM
Joint Notice of Withdrawal of document by Christy Le JL Corporation. *** Documents terminated:12 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Groseclose, Mathew). Modified text on 10/5/2023 (mga)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/05 11:41 AM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clement Asante for Christy Le JL Corporation,Clement Asante for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/05 11:03 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew Frontz for Christy Le JL Corporation,Matthew Frontz for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/05 10:53 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added LaTasha Snipes for Christy Le JL Corporation,LaTasha Snipes for Christy Le (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/5/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 10/05 10:58 AM
Notice to LaTasha Snipes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 10/05 11:05 AM
Notice to mfrontz@polsinelli.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 10/05 11:42 AM
Notice to casante@polsinelli.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 10/04 6:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clement Asante Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246196. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 10/04 6:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Frontz Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246193. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 10/04 6:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LaTasha Snipes Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6246191. by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
15 15 respoth Response In Opposition Mon 10/02 12:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation by Christy Le JL Corporation. (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 7:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew Ryan Groseclose on behalf of Christy Le JL Corporation (Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 09/27 8:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and , COUNTERCLAIM against Contego Spa Designs, Inc. by Christy Le JL Corporation.(Groseclose, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, September 21, 2023
12 12 motion Entry of Default Thu 09/21 2:42 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christy Le JL Corporation by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/11 5:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Christy Le JL Corporation served on 8/30/2023, answer due 9/20/2023.(Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, August 31, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/31 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Thomas Placey on behalf of Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Placey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/24 4:39 PM
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Neal M. Cohen for Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/24/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/24 7:50 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James K. Sakaguchi for Contego Spa Designs, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/23/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Thu 08/24 7:37 AM
REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (jm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 08/24 7:52 AM
Notice to James K. Sakaguchi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/31/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 08/24 4:40 PM
Notice to Neal M. Cohen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/31/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/23 3:22 PM
NOTICE of AO 120 - Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by CONTEGO SPA DESIGNS, INC. (Coughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 08/23 3:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James K. Sakaguchi Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6194641. by CONTEGO SPA DESIGNS, INC.. (Coughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 08/23 3:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Neal M. Cohen Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6194607. by CONTEGO SPA DESIGNS, INC.. (Coughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 08/23 3:15 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to CHRISTY LE JL CORPORATION d/b/a US NAILS, CHRISTY LE. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(jm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/23 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTEGO SPA DESIGNS, INC.. (Coughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/23 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Christy Le JL Corporation d/b/a US Nails, Christy Le with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6194481) , filed by Contego Spa Design, Inc..(Coughlin, Richard) Modified Docket Text on 8/23/2023 (cjs). Modified text on 8/23/2023 (jm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/23 3:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jm)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Wed 08/23 3:10 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (jm)
Related: [-]