Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11200

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:23-bk-11215
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC
7447 Sepulveda Blvd.
Van Nuys, CA 91405
Represented By
Ron Bender
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
18 18 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 10/16 6:14 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Pfister, Robert. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
17 17 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 07/18 10:37 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (RT)
Related: [-] 13 Transfer of Claim (Fee) filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC,14 Transfer of Claim (Fee) filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC,15 Transfer of Claim (Fee) filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC,16 Transfer of Claim (Fee) filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 claims Transfer of Claim (Fee) Wed 07/17 8:36 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: THE BALLOONERY INC. To RT Lending, LLC Fee Amount $28 To RT Lending, LLC Filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
15 15 claims Transfer of Claim (Fee) Wed 07/17 8:35 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: SAC ICE To RT Lending, LLC Fee Amount $28 To RT Lending, LLC Filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 claims Transfer of Claim (Fee) Wed 07/17 8:33 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: ISINGS CULLIGAN LIVERMORE To RT Lending, LLC Fee Amount $28 To RT Lending, LLC Filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
13 13 claims Transfer of Claim (Fee) Wed 07/17 8:31 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CITIZENS MEDICAL RESPONSE To RT Lending, LLC Fee Amount $28 To RT Lending, LLC9526 W. Pico Blvd.Los Angeles, CA 90035 Filed by Interested Party RT Lending, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/17 8:37 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim (Fee)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57128395. Fee amount 28.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/17 8:37 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim (Fee)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57128395. Fee amount 28.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#14
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/17 8:37 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim (Fee)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57128395. Fee amount 28.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#15
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/17 8:37 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim (Fee)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57128395. Fee amount 28.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Wed 11/01 12:00 PM
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for a Certified Copy Wed 11/01 10:26 AM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. The document will be sent via email to :lourdes@lnbyg.com: Filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC Related [+]. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 11/01 10:50 AM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56117372. Fee amount 11.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 11
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 misc Amended List of Creditors (Fee) Fri 10/06 6:07 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $32 Filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 10/06 6:33 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215-VK] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56022632. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Monday, August 28, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Mon 08/28 11:34 AM
Notice Notice Of Joint Administration Of Cases And Requirements For Filing Documents Filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC Related [+]. (Oh, Juliet)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 09/6/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/6/2023. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/6/2023. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/6/2023. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/6/2023. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/6/2023. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/6/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/6/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 09/6/2023. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/6/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/6/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 09/6/2023.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/22/2023
Sunday, August 27, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/27 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 137. Notice Date 08/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Saturday, August 26, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/26 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 ORDER for joint administration (BNC-PDF)
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/26 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/26 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC
Friday, August 25, 2023
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Fri 08/25 11:59 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/18/2023 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 12/18/2023. (AG1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
3 3 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/24 12:32 PM
ORDER Granting Motion To Approve Joint Administration of Cases (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/24/2023. (PG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
2 2 motion Ex parte application (motion) Wed 08/23 5:33 PM
Ex parte application Debtor's Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Declaration Of Tianxiang "Shawn" Zhou In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC (Oh, Juliet)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 08/23 2:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 09/6/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/6/2023. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/6/2023. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/6/2023. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/6/2023. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/6/2023. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/6/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/6/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 09/6/2023. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/6/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/6/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 09/6/2023.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/22/2023 (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 08/23 3:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:23-bk-11215] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B55840958. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1