Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:23-cv-01512
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES
Represented By
Phillip E Raymond
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHRYN PIERSON
Represented By
Joseph H. Chivers
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 11/22 1:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by KATHRYN PIERSON. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 order Order Mon 11/13 1:10 PM
TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the13 Notice of Settlement in Principle, counsel shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal or Joint Status Report by December 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/13/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjm)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/13 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Settlement in Principle by RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES (Raymond, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 10/31 8:29 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Resort Lifestyle Communities' response to the Complaint is now due on or before November 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/31/2023. (cjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 10/30 4:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES. (Raymond, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/28 5:08 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Resort Lifestyle Communities' response to the Complaint at1 is now due on or before October 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/28/2023. (cjm)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 09/28 11:19 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES. (Raymond, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 09/12 11:54 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Resort Lifestyle Communities has until 9/28/2023 to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/12/2023. (cjm)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 09/12 11:36 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES. (Raymond, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip E Raymond on behalf of RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES. (Raymond, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Fri 08/25 7:55 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATHRYN PIERSON. RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, August 24, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/24 11:25 AM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/24/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/23 2:33 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Judge on this Court. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/23/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/23 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES (sdp)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/23 5:01 PM
Judge Marilyn J. Horan Presiding. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 08/23 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against RESORT LIFESTYLE COMMUNITIES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7844822), filed by KATHRYN PIERSON. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet