City of Pompano Beach v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04186 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:23-cv-61372 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Pompano Beach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 08/23 5:12 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Southern (associated as of 8/22/2023), 0:23-cv-61372, City of Pompano Beach v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04186-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:23-cv-61372. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Civil Case Closed per DE#14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel.. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Chemguard, Inc. response/answer due 9/5/2023; TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, LP response/answer due 9/5/2023. Per Order, DE#12 . (nan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Clerk's Notice to Filer re6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |