California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 5:23-cv-01703
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of the State of CA Riverside, CVRI2302945
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 2:12 AM PST
Defendant
ATS Specialized, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Dmitri Brauns
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Kathryn Callaghan
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anderson Trucking Services, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Dmitri Brauns
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Kathryn Callaghan
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Anthony Lombardo
Represented By
Nicholas Dmitri Brauns
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Kathryn Callaghan
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Nunez
Represented By
Robert Steven Walch
Law Office Of Gary Walch Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Nunez
Represented By
Robert Steven Walch
Law Office Of Gary Walch Alc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 11/28/2023


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 10:32 PM
Notice filed by PLAINTIFF Mario Nunez. (Walch, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
27 27 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/25 11:37 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) JOINT NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION25 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: THE COURT, having been notified by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled on or about September 20, 2024; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from thisCourts active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 60 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/20 7:12 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Pursuant to Notice JOINT NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION25 , the 9/23/2024 Zoom Status Conference re: Settlement at 11:00 AM is hereby vacated. No appearance necessary on 9/23/2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/20 1:26 PM
Notice JOINT NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION; ORDER filed by Plaintiff Juan Nunez, Mario Nunez. (Walch, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
24 24 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Partially Resolved Fri 05/31 6:46 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Matthew P Lane: Mediation held on 5/16/24 and the case has been partially resolved. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must file a joint stipulation regarding those claims which have been resolved. The following issues remain for this Court to resolve: Settled as to Plaintiff Mario Nunez only; Plaintiff Juan Nunez's claims against Defendants were not resolved.. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Lane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
23 23 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Tue 03/26 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for 5/16/24.(Lane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
22 22 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 02/22 7:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Matthew P Lane has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 02/20 4:09 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Matthew Lane may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc., Mark Anthony Lombardo(Callaghan, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
20 20 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Fri 01/26 1:46 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 16, 2024. Status Conference set for September 23, 2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/25 7:35 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Hearing held by Zoom and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel, as stated on the record, and sets the deadlines and hearings, as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2024. Factual Discovery cut-off is 11/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2025. Expert Disclosure cut-off is 12/13/2024. Expert Rebuttal cut-off is 1/13/2025. Expert Discovery cut-off is 2/3/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/16/2024. Status Conference re: Settlement is set for 9/23/2024 at 11:00 AM by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's Website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. Pretrial Conference/Motions in Limine (MIL) Hearing is set for 4/7/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial (7-10 day estimate) is set for 5/13/2025 at 9:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Attorney for Plaintiffs: Erin Polisano. Attorney for Defendants: Nicholas Brauns. Courtroom Deputy: Catherine Jeang. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (cj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 01/12 2:46 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant ATS Specialized, Inc.. (Callaghan, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 01/02 9:53 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Mark Anthony Lombardo.(Attorney Kathryn Callaghan added to party Mark Anthony Lombardo(pty:dft))(Callaghan, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause Tue 12/19 2:52 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than January 9, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant MARK ANTHONY LOMBARDO, only. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. Plaintiffs are advised that the Court will consider an answer by defendant MARK ANTHONY LOMBARDO, or plaintiffs request for entry of default on this defendants on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Declaration Tue 12/19 1:46 PM
DECLARATION of Erin M. Polisano, Esq. filed by Plaintiffs Juan Nunez, Mario Nunez. (Walch, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/28 5:06 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND DOE DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than December 19, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant MARK ANTHONY LOMBARDO, only. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11/28 4:37 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 1/22/2024 at 11:00 AM by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
12 12 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 11/15 12:22 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
11 11 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 11/14 2:00 PM
(Walch, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/24 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/23 9:33 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/23 9:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Wed 08/23 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01703 CAS (MRWx). (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Wed 08/23 9:08 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Michael R. Wilner. New Case Number 5:23-cv-1703 CAS (MRWx). (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
5 5 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc. and Anderson Trucking Service, Inc. ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc... (Brauns, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc. identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Brauns, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 DECLARATION of Nicholas D. Brauns re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc.. (Brauns, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc.. (Brauns, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2302945 Receipt No: ACACDC-35891753 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Anderson Trucking Services, Inc., ATS Specialized, Inc.. (Attorney Nicholas Dmitri Brauns added to party ATS Specialized, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Dmitri Brauns added to party Anderson Trucking Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brauns, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 08/23 9:39 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc., Does 1 to 100, Mark Anthony Lombardo. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Mario Nunez, Juan Nunez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/8/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 08/23 9:42 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants ATS Specialized, Inc., Anderson Trucking Services, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/18/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
Related: [-]