California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-01591
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 12:38 AM PST
Defendant
AFJP Services Corp.
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Amar Othman
Represented By
Peter J Porter
Law Offices Peter J Porter
contact info
Plaintiff
Safeway Tax Relief, Inc.
Represented By
David Ryan Welch
Enso Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
38 38 stip Dismiss Case Tue 05/28 5:05 PM
Corrected STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc..(Welch, David)
Related: [-]
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Tue 05/28 5:03 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc..(Welch, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
36 36 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/10 10:22 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed April 09, 2024 [Dkt.35 ] indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed on inactive status. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. No later than August 1, 2024, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this action being deemed dismissed as of August 2, 2024. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
35 35 notice Settlement Tue 04/09 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc.. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Tue 04/09 2:20 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby ORDERS the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Request for Judicial Notice32 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request Substitute Attorney; Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; Party is advised only individuals may represent themselves pro se. No organization or entity, including corporations, may appear in any action or proceeding unless represented by an attorney permitted to practice before this Court. See Local Civil Rule 83-2.2.2. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
33 33 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 04/02 9:09 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Request for Judicial Notice32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Request Substitute Attorney. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
32 32 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 04/01 9:36 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY filed by Defendants AFJP Services Corp., Amar Othman. (Attorney Peter J Porter added to party AFJP Services Corp.(pty:dft))(Porter, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
31 31 misc Financial Entry Tue 02/20 9:01 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $1,500.00 from Peter J. Porter Client Trust Account. Re: Order,23 . Receipt number 13712. (fa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
30 30 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 01/31 4:41 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/29/2024. (npo)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 01/31 4:40 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2024. Discovery cut-off 9/27/2024. Motions due by 12/5/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/29/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
28 28 misc Disclosure Mon 01/29 1:52 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE Defendant's Initial Disclosure filed by Defendant Amar Othman (Porter, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 01/26 11:35 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Scheduling Conference set for February 1, 2024, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
26 26 order Protective Order Thu 01/18 4:06 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order25 . See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
25 25 stip Protective Order Wed 01/17 11:18 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc..(Welch, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 01/17 11:12 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc... (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Wed 01/03 12:35 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order SANCTIONING Defendants and Defense Counsel for Failure to Comply with Court Orders by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED defendants Amar Othman and AFJP Services Corp. and their counsel, Peter J. Porter, shall pay to the Court the sum of $500.00 each as sanctions no later than February 19, 2024. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
22 22 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 12/21 8:17 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on the above date. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
21 21 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 12/19 11:09 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Kenly Kiya Kato: On November 22, 2023, this Court issued an Order directing the parties to file a "Joint Case Management Statement within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order." Dkt.18 . Plaintiff filed a separate statement on December 7, 2023 indicating it was unable to file a joint statement because defense counsel had not responded to Plaintiff's counsel's "email requesting coordination of filing the ordered joint statement." Dkt.19 . On December 18, 2023, Defendants filed an untimely separate statement which makes no mention of the Court's Order requiring a joint statement nor any attempt to justify the untimely filing. Dkt.20 . Accordingly, Defendants are HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than December 26, 2023 why each Defendant and Defendants' counsel should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500.00 each for failure to comply with the Court's Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
20 20 misc Statement Mon 12/18 12:51 PM
STATEMENT Defendant's Case Management Statement filed by Defendant Amar Othman (Porter, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
19 19 misc Statement Thu 12/07 5:24 PM
STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc. (Oh, Seungjai)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
18 18 4 pgs order Order Wed 11/22 10:17 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
17 17 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 11/21 10:25 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-125) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-01591-KK-DFMx. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/03 1:38 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Amar Othman. (Attorney Peter J Porter added to party Amar Othman(pty:dft))(Porter, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
15 15 2 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 08/28 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc., (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 08/28 4:36 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Safeway Tax Relief, Inc.. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 08/28 2:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Safeway Tax Relief, Inc.. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 17 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 08/28 10:36 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 26, 2023
11 11 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Sat 08/26 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Sat 08/26 10:58 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/25 6:21 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant AFJP Services Corp. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/25 6:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Amar Othman. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AOthman
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 08/25 4:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/25 4:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 08/25 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 08/23 7:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiff SAFEWAY TAX RELIEF, INC., a California Corporation. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 08/23 7:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiff SAFEWAY TAX RELIEF, INC., a California Corporation. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/23 7:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SAFEWAY TAX RELIEF, INC., a California Corporation. (Welch, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/23 6:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35915286 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SAFEWAY TAX RELIEF, INC., a California Corporation. (Attorney David Ryan Welch added to party SAFEWAY TAX RELIEF, INC., a California Corporation(pty:pla))(Welch, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 COVER SHEET,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 1A,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 COVER SHEET,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2A,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2B,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2C,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3 COVER SHEET,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3A,
Att: 10 Exhibit 3B,
Att: 11 Exhibit 4 COVER SHEET,
Att: 12 Exhibit 4A,
Att: 13 Exhibit 4B,
Att: 14 Exhibit 5 COVER SHEET,
Att: 15 Exhibit 5A,
Att: 16 Exhibit 5B,
Att: 17 Exhibit 6 COVER SHEET,
Att: 18 Exhibit 6A,
Att: 19 Exhibit 6B,
Att: 20 Exhibit 7 COVER SHEET,
Att: 21 Exhibit 7A,
Att: 22 Exhibit 7B,
Att: 23 Exhibit 8 COVER SHEET,
Att: 24 Exhibit 8A,
Att: 25 Exhibit 8B