Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00454
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 24, 2023 2:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Tracy M. Fiorenza (1)
Represented By
Daniel J. Hesler
Federal Defender Program
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam L Rosenbloom
Doj-Usao
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/24/2023 3:21 AM CDT
Monday, August 21, 2023
ARREST of defendant Tracy M. Fiorenza. (jn, )
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) Affidavit in Removal Proceedings signed by Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cummings as to Tracy M. Fiorenza (1). (ph, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ENTERED IN ERROR. (jn, ) Modified on 8/22/2023 (jn, ).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Tracy M. Fiorenza: Initial appearance and removal proceeding hearing held. Defendant appeared in custody in response to arrest on 8/21/23. Attorney, Daniel Hesler, appears on behalf of the defendant and is granted leave to file an appearance pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act. Defendant is advised of her rights and informed of the charges against her as well as of the possible sentence and fine if convicted of those charges. Defendant waives the identity hearing. The Court finds that Defendant Tracy Fiorenza is the person named in the arrest warrant and Complaint issued by the Southern District of Florida. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f)(1), the Court confirms the prosecutor's continuing obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, to disclose information favorable to the defendant that is material to guilt or punishment. Failure to disclose may result in various consequences, including but not limited to: exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, a mistrial, dismissal of charges, vacatur of a conviction or guilty plea, disciplinary action against the prosecution, and contempt proceedings. The Government moves for pretrial detention and the Court finds that a detention hearing is warranted pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3142(f)(1)(A) or, alternatively, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3142(f)(1)(E). Detention hearing set for 8/23/23 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 1743. Defendant shall also advise the Court as to whether she wants a preliminary examination hearing on 8/23/23. Defendant shall be remanded into the custody of the United States Marshals Service until further order of the Court. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 8/21/2023. Mailed notice. (jn, )
Related: [-]
5 5 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Tracy M. Fiorenza (SEALED). (jn, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Appointing Counsel. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 8/21/2023. Mailed notice. (jn, )
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Tracy M. Fiorenza. (jn, )
Related: [-]