California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-03048
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 24, 2023 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Jesus Mosqueda
Federal Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Sandor Anthony Callahan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/24/2023 12:54 AM PDT
Monday, August 21, 2023
Arrest of Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (yem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez.(yem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez: Initial Appearance set for 8/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jesus Mosqueda appearing for Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (Mosqueda, Jesus)Attorney Jesus Mosqueda added to party Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez(pty:dft) (stn).
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (Mosqueda, Jesus)(stn).
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez held on 8/22/2023. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Detention Hearing as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez held on 8/22/2023. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention filed by Court. Bond set as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 8/31/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 9/19/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.) (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 8/22/2023 AHG 23-1:2:05-2:28). (Plaintiff Attorney Aaron McElhose AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Lee FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/22/23. (aum)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (aum)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/22/23. (aje)
Related: [-]