District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00286
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 24, 2023 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
SAEVE EVANS (1)
Represented By
Maria Jacob
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin F. Song
Doj-Usao
contact info
Colin Joseph Cloherty
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/24/2023 4:08 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1). (zltp) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
Thursday, August 03, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Status Hearing as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS held on 8/3/2023. Defendant not present in the courtroom. Case called for Return on Arrest Warrant/Initial Appearance but not held, for reasons set forth on the record. Return on Arrest Warrant/Initial Appearance continued to 8/8/2023 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Medical/Mental Health Alert issued to the Department of Corrections Medical Unit as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Held Without Bond; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 4: [11:08:20-11:12:08]; Defense Attorney: Maria Jacob; US Attorney: Justin Song; Pretrial Officer: Andre Sidbury. (znjb) Modified on 8/3/2023 (ztl). [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Justin F. Song appearing for USA. (Song, Justin) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colin Joseph Cloherty appearing for USA. (Cloherty, Colin) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS: Initial Appearance reset for 8/11/2023 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
Arrest of SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by SAEVE EDWARD EVANS. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
MOTION to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General by USA as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: In Person Return on Arrest Warrant/ Initial Appearance as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1) held on 8/11/2023. Defendant was present in the courtroom. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel by SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1); heard and granted. FPD, Maria Jacob was appointed for SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1). The Court advised the Government of its due process obligations under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion by the Government to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1); heard and granted. Defendant conceded detention at this time and reserved the right to address detention at a later time. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial Waiver as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1); heard and granted. Time between 8/11/2023, and 9/11/2023, shall be excluded from calculation of time in the interest of justice (XT) under the Speedy Trial Act. Preliminary Hearing/ Status Hearing set for 9/11/2023 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 7- In Person before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [1:23:46-1:33:35]; Defense Attorney: Maria Jacob; U.S. Attorney: Colin Cloherty; Pretrial Officer: Chrstine Schuck. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS (1): As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/11/2023. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant, dated 8/2/2023, Returned Executed on 8/2/2023 as to SAEVE EDWARD EVANS. (bb) [1:23-mj-00193-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
8 8 INDICTMENT as to SAEVE EVANS (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION). (zstd)
Related: [-]