Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03076

Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Case #: 1:23-cv-23212
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Terminated:Aug 23, 2023
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:23-cv-03974
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 3:17 AM EST
Defendant
SB Group US, Inc.
Defendant
Sino Global Capital Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Sino Global Capital Limited
Defendant
SoftBank Global Advisers Limited
Defendant
SoftBank Investment Advisers (UK) Limited
Defendant
Softbank Group Corp.
Defendant
Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited
Defendant
Temasek International (USA) LLC
Plaintiff
Leandro Cabo
Represented By
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunil Kavuri
Represented By
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Rupprecht
Represented By
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vitor Vozza
Represented By
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warren Winter
Represented By
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
12 12 Initial Scheduling and Case Management Order. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
11 11 PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. The Court notes that this case is a member case in In Re: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation, 1:23-md-03076-KMM. In the interests of judicial economy, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is STAYED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to administratively close this case for statistical purposes, while the claims proceed under 1:23-md-03076-KMM. The Court shall retain jurisdiction and the case shall be restored to the active docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change so that the action may proceed to final disposition. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/23/2023. (rfr) (jas)
Related: [-]
10 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. (jas)
Related: [-]
9 9 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-03974. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
8 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3), MDL 3076. In Re: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation. Signed by MDL Panel on 8/21/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Rupprecht, Vitor Vozza, Leandro Cabo, Warren Winter, Sunil Kavuri. Temasek International (USA) LLC served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Rupprecht, Vitor Vozza, Leandro Cabo, Sunil Kavuri. Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to SB Group US, Inc., Sino Global Capital Holdings, LLC, Sino Global Capital Limited, SoftBank Group Corp., Softbank Global Advisers Limited, Softbank Investment Advisers (UK) Limited, Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited, Temasek International (USA) LLC. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 160 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18522122.). Filed byKyle Rupprecht, Vitor Vozza, Leandro Cabo, Warren Winter, Sunil Kavuri.(Saveri, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit D,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet