Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 0:23-cv-61626
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
pinoyeflix.com
Defendant
tvstambayan.net
Defendant
teleserye.cam
Defendant
tambayanlambingans.net
Defendant
pinoytvteleseryes.com
Defendant
pinoytvtambayanss.su
Defendant
pinoytambayanhdtv.net
Defendant
pinoyreplaysteleserye.su
Defendant
pinoyhdflixs.su
Defendant
pinoyflixtvtambayan.mobi
Defendant
pinoyflixshd.su
Defendant
pinoyflixlambingan.ph
Defendant
pinoyflixlambingan.net
Defendant
piinoyteleserye.net
Defendant
piinoytambayan.su
Defendant
moviehab.asia
Defendant
lambingantvs.com
Defendant
lambinganpinoytv.net
Defendant
kdramastoday.online
Defendant
fuziwara.com
Defendant
funfactorhd.online
Defendant
docweb.online
Plaintiff
ABS-CBN International
Represented By
Christine Ann Daley
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Ann Daley
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
ABS-CBN Corporation
Represented By
Christine Ann Daley
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
32 32 misc Form AO 120/121 Wed 10/18 10:59 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Judgment - Default Wed 10/18 10:56 AM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International against docweb.online, funfactorhd.online, fuziwara.com, kdramastoday.online, lambinganpinoytv.net, lambingantvs.com, moviehab.asia, piinoytambayan.su, piinoyteleserye.net, pinoyeflix.com, pinoyflixlambingan.net, pinoyflixlambingan.ph, pinoyflixshd.su, pinoyflixtvtambayan.mobi, pinoyhdflixs.su, pinoyreplaysteleserye.su, pinoytambayanhdtv.net, pinoytvtambayanss.su, pinoytvteleseryes.com, tambayanlambingans.net, teleserye.cam, tvstambayan.net Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 10/18 10:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting28 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/04 11:36 AM
Order To Show Cause Why The Court Should Not Grant Motion For Final Default Judgment. Defendants are hereby order to Show Cause on or before October 17, 2023 why Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment against Defendants [DE28 ] should not be granted. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
28 28 motion Default Judgment Tue 10/03 3:16 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International.(Daley, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction
Monday, October 02, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 10/02 11:09 AM
Order To Show Cause For Lack Of Prosecution re1 Complaint, filed by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International. On or before October 9, 2023, Plaintiff shall either move for default judgment or show cause why it has not done so. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
26 26 order Preliminary Injunction Fri 09/22 12:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting5 Plaintiffs' Application for Entry of Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes MOTION Hearing or Evidentiary Motion Hearing Fri 09/22 11:45 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2023 re5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International. Defendants failed to appear. Court will enter proposed order granting preliminary injunction. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christine Ann Daley, Court Reporter: Patricia Bailey-Entin, 305-523-5635 / Patricia_BaileyEntin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
24 24 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Thu 09/21 2:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to docweb.online, funfactorhd.online, fuziwara.com, kdramastoday.online, lambinganpinoytv.net, lambingantvs.com, moviehab.asia, piinoytambayan.su, piinoyteleserye.net, pinoyeflix.com, pinoyflixlambingan.net, pinoyflixlambingan.ph, pinoyflixshd.su, pinoyflixtvtambayan.mobi, pinoyhdflixs.su, pinoyreplaysteleserye.su, pinoytambayanhdtv.net, pinoytvtambayanss.su, pinoytvteleseryes.com, tambayanlambingans.net, teleserye.cam, tvstambayan.net - Motions Terminated:23 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/21/2023. (pcs)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/21 2:14 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to docweb.online, funfactorhd.online, fuziwara.com, kdramastoday.online, lambinganpinoytv.net, lambingantvs.com, moviehab.asia, piinoytambayan.su, piinoyteleserye.net, pinoyeflix.com, pinoyflixlambingan.net, pinoyflixlambingan.ph, pinoyflixshd.su, pinoyflixtvtambayan.mobi, pinoyhdflixs.su, pinoyreplaysteleserye.su, pinoytambayanhdtv.net, pinoytvtambayanss.su, pinoytvteleseryes.com, tambayanlambingans.net, teleserye.cam, tvstambayan.net by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/21 1:27 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International of E-mail Inquiry Received From Defendant Number 2 in Connection with Service (Daley, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of E-mail Inquiry Received from Defendant Number 2 in Connection with Service
21 21 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 09/21 12:49 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International. docweb.online served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; funfactorhd.online served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; fuziwara.com served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; kdramastoday.online served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; lambinganpinoytv.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; lambingantvs.com served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; moviehab.asia served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; piinoytambayan.su served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; piinoyteleserye.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyeflix.com served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyflixlambingan.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyflixlambingan.ph served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyflixshd.su served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyflixtvtambayan.mobi served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyhdflixs.su served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoyreplaysteleserye.su served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoytambayanhdtv.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoytvtambayanss.su served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; pinoytvteleseryes.com served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; tambayanlambingans.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; teleserye.cam served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023; tvstambayan.net served on 8/30/2023, response/answer due 9/20/2023.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service
20 20 3 pgs service Certificate of Service Thu 09/21 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International re15 Order on Motion to Unseal Case,11 Motion to Unseal Case, 16 Notice of Compliance,12 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es),5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ,6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) ,1 Complaint,14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,8 Order on Ex Parte Motion,10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear to Appear Telephonically, or Alternatively, Continue Hearing Scheduled for September 23, 2023 in Connection with Preliminary Injunction . Attorney/Representative: Christine Ann Daley ,9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,3 Form AO 120/121, 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment,7 Order on Ex Parte Motion,4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/21 12:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International re6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) ,1 Complaint,9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/21 12:36 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International re1 Complaint,9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice
Thursday, August 24, 2023
4 4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International identifying Other Affiliate PCD Nominee Corporation, Other Affiliate ABS-CBN Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Lopez, Inc. for ABS-CBN Corporation (Daley, Christine)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (rbe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1309166)
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 6 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1309166)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16867335, filed by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit to Complaint