Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11235

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:23-bk-11234
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2023

Debtor
Pegasus Home Fashions Intermediate Inc.
107 Trumbull St. Building G-1
Elizabeth, NJ 07206
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Joseph F. Cudia
U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Monday, October 09, 2023
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 10/09 10:56 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Pegasus Home Fashions Intermediate Inc.. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs
Monday, August 28, 2023
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Mon 08/28 8:44 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration An Order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Pegasus Home Fashions Intermediate Inc.; PegasusHome Fashions Purchaser Inc.; Pegasus Home Fashions, Inc.; and Weatherford Cushion Co. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Pegasus Home Fashions, Inc., Case No. 23-11235 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 8/25/2023 (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 08/24 8:24 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-11234 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11220302, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 08/24 8:07 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Pegasus Home Fashions Intermediate Inc.. (Nestor, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 08/24 8:30 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 08/24 9:39 AM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Cudia, Joseph)
Related: [-]