Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:23-cv-01759
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-01263
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 20, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Vanguard Group Incorporated
Represented By
Jill Johnson Chasson
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Sarah E Bouchard
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp - Philadelphia, PA
contact info
Shannon Ammon
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp - Philadelphia, PA
contact info
Shelby Krafka
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp - Philadelphia, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Rothman
Represented By
Patricia V Pierce
Weir Greenblatt Pierce LLP
contact info
Michael P Broadhurst
Weir Greenblatt Pierce LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/06 3:06 PM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc.37 ) and dismissing this case without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Telephonic Scheduling Conference Set for December 7, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/6/2023. (WLP)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/06 2:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joseph Rothman.(Broadhurst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
36 36 misc Transcript Tue 11/21 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE proceedings held on 11/09/2023 before Chief Judge G. MURRAY SNOW. [Court Reporter: Teri Veres, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7251]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 12/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2024. (RAP)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Transcript Request Thu 11/16 2:58 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Vanguard Group Incorporated for proceedings held on 11/9/2023, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Krafka, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
34 34 misc Transcript Request Wed 11/15 4:24 PM
*( CANCELLED BY REQUESTER VIA EMAIL ON 16NOV2023 @ 12:28PM )* - TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (MEDIA) by Sabrina Kharrazi of Ignites (New York,NY) for proceedings held on 11/09/2023, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) *Modified to reference cancellation of request on 11/16/2023 (RAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
33 33 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Thu 11/09 4:56 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2023. The parties advise the Court that they have reached a settlement. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/7/2023 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. If the parties file the appropriate Notice of Settlement or Stipulation for Dismissal prior to the Telephonic Scheduling Conference, the conference will be vacated. APPEARANCES: Michael Broadhurst and Patricia Pierce for Plaintiff. Sarah Bouchard for Defendant. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 1:41 PM to 1:43 P M. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
32 32 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 11/02 6:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joseph Rothman.(Broadhurst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 15, 2023
31 31 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/15 12:57 PM
ORDER - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/15/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 09/14 2:13 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge G Murray Snow for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 23-01759 PHX-GMS. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/14/2023. (RMV)
Related: [-]
29 29 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/14 7:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O. Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 23-1759 PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
28 28 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Thu 09/14 7:56 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 09/05 8:14 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael P Broadhurst on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Rothman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 09/01 10:03 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shelby Krafka on behalf of Defendant Vanguard Group Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/31 10:09 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Patricia V Pierce on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Rothman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/31 10:10 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sarah E Bouchard on behalf of Defendant Vanguard Group Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/31 2:00 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shannon Ammon on behalf of Defendant Vanguard Group Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 08/30 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Johnson Chasson on behalf of Vanguard Group Incorporated. (Chasson, Jill)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 08/25 10:27 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL - That this case be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 23-01759 PHX-ESW. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/25/23.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
24 24 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 08/25 8:35 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL - Case reassigned, by random lot, to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 23-01759 PHX-DLR. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/24/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Fri 08/25 10:29 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 08/24 3:26 PM
ORDER that this matter is reassigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 23-01759 PHX-DJH. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/24/2023. (REK)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/24 10:50 AM
NOTICE Re Transfer of 2:23-cv-1263 from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV 23-01759 PHX-MTL. (MAP)
Related: [-]
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 08/24 10:44 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01263 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
20 20 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE (DOC. NO. 10) IS GRANTED. THE MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/23/23.8/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
CASE TRANSFERRED TO DISTRICT OF ARIZONA VIA CM/ECF ELECTRONIC TRANSFER. (jaa, ) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
19 19 JOINT STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, WITH COURT APPROVAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/17/23. 8/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
18 18 STIPULATION [Proposed] Joint Stipulation of Confidentiality and Protective Order by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..(Krafka, Shelby) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
17 17 ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..(Krafka, Shelby) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
16 16 RESPONSE in Support re10 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..(AMMON, SHANNON) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
15 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 First MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by JOSEPH ROTHMAN.(PIERCE, PATRICIA) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
14 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., filed by JOSEPH ROTHMAN.(PIERCE, PATRICIA) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
13 13 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by JOSEPH ROTHMAN. (BROADHURST, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH ROTHMAN re5 Order (BROADHURST, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
11 11 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(AMMON, SHANNON) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
10 10 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(AMMON, SHANNON) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum
9 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC..(AMMON, SHANNON) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Krafka on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(Krafka, Shelby) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH E. BOUCHARD on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(BOUCHARD, SARAH) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON AMMON on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(AMMON, SHANNON) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
5 5 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/19/2023. 4/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
4 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Court House Legal Services, Inc. re: served Summons and Complaint upon The Vanguard Group, Inc. by Affidavit of Service on April 5, 2023 (PIERCE, PATRICIA) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. BROADHURST on behalf of JOSEPH ROTHMAN with Certificate of Service(BROADHURST, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
2 2 Summons Issued as to THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: Patricia V. Pearce on 4/3/23 (fdc) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16600288.), filed by JOSEPH ROTHMAN.(PIERCE, PATRICIA) [Transferred from paed on 8/24/2023.]
Related: [-]