New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:23-cv-07527
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2023
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 20, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Counter Claimant
McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Represented By
Lauren Jillian Zimmerman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info
David Scott Flugman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
McKinsey & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Seth Goldstrom
Represented By
Reid Mason Figel
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Seth Goldstrom
Represented By
Reid Mason Figel
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Represented By
Lauren Jillian Zimmerman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info
David Scott Flugman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info
Interpleader Defendant
McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC
Interpleader Defendant
McKinsey & Co., Inc.
Interpleader Defendant
McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Interpleader Defendant
McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff
Seth Goldstrom
Represented By
Reid Mason Figel
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Robert Klipper
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick Pllc (dc)
contact info
Elliston Perot Bissell
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel And Frederick PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
McKinsey & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Seth Goldstrom
Represented By
Reid Mason Figel
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
McKinsey & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Ronald Charles Minkoff
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
Regina Gerhardt
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
contact info
John B. Harris
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Represented By
Lauren Jillian Zimmerman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info
David Scott Flugman
Selendy Gay PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
76 76 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/10 1:45 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by all parties and their respective counsel that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, and all pending motions are withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 44 and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/10/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
75 75 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/10 9:54 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Seth Goldstrom, McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Figel, Reid)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/10 9:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Reid Figel. RE-FILE Document No. 74 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): individual party whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
74 74 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/09 3:43 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Figel, Reid) Modified on 9/10/2024 (nd).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
73 73 order Memo Endorsement Tue 09/03 10:48 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (72 in 1:23-cv-07527-JMF) Letter request that they be permitted to submit a jointletter, no later than September 11, 2024 filed by Seth Goldstrom. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall submit a status letter no later than September 11, 2024. If the parties do not reach a settlement in principle by that date, the Court will turn to the motion with an eye toward issuing a prompt ruling. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/3/24) (yv)
Related: [-]