California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-07019
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 20, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Chersti Croft
Defendant
Paul Croft
Plaintiff
United Van Lines LLC
Represented By
Gregg S Garfinkel
Stone Dean LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, July 08, 2024
31 31 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 07/08 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/06 6:08 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Paul Croft (DKT.29 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: Plaintiff has set the motion for a day the court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. Counsel is directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this court's Procedures and Schedules page found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion may be stricken for failing to set it on a date the court is hearing motions. The court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from 6/21/2024 to 7/12/2024 at 01:30 PM. The precise time of the hearing may change upon the issuance of the final calendar for that date. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
29 29 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/24 5:16 PM
First APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Paul Croft filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. Application set for hearing on 6/21/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Gregg S. Garfinkel in support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of United Van Lines in Support of Application for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 9:38 AM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST PAUL CROFT24 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu, re Stipulation24 : The Court, however, in the interest of judicial efficiency, exercises its discretion to construe the Request as a motion and grants the requested relief, extending Plaintiff's deadline to May 28, 2024, to move for default judgment against defendant Paul Croft. See L.R. 74 (noting that the court "may" decline to consider a motion unless it meets the requirements of the Local Rules). The Court, however, strongly admonishes Plaintiffa represented party-to comply with the applicable rules going forward or risk dismissal of its lawsuit. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 05/22 9:24 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (Dkts.21 &22 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On4/30/24, the court Ordered Plaintiff to Show Cause in writing ("OSC") why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendants Paul Croft & Chersti Croft. Plaintiff filed Stipulations on 5/14/2024. The Court accepts the Stipulations as responses to the Orders to Show Cause. Having reviewed Plaintiff's responses the court DISCHARGES the OSC. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 05/22 9:11 AM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION TO DISMISS SETTLING DEFENDANT CHERSTI CROFT25 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party25 : Pursuant to Plaintiff's Stipulation to Dismiss Settling Defendant Chersti Croft, (Docket No. 25), and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant CHERSTI CROFT is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm) Modified on 5/22/2024 (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
25 25 stip Dismiss Party Tue 05/14 12:48 PM
First STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Chersti Croft filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC.(Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 stip Extension of Time to File Document Tue 05/14 12:34 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC.(Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
23 23 misc Declaration Tue 05/07 11:30 AM
DECLARATION of Gregg S. Garfinkel re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,22 filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 5/7/2024, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendant Chersti Croft. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). (lom)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 11:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than May 14, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendant Paul Croft. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff filing a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (FRCivP 55b). (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/23 10:23 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Declaration of Gregg S. Garfinkel18 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules. To seek the extension of a deadline, Plaintiff must either file a noticed motion, L.R. 7-4, with a proposed order in accordance with L.R. 5-4.4 or file a stipulation, L.R. 7-1, and a proposed order regarding the same. L.R. 52-4.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 04/15 12:12 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Declaration18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request - Order. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. Any Request is set on the Judge's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
18 18 misc Declaration Fri 04/12 1:19 PM
DECLARATION of Gregg S. Garfinkel re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form17 filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 02/29 2:19 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Paul Croft (lom)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 02/29 12:35 PM
First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Paul Croft filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Gregg S. Garfinkel in support of Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Paul Croft
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/06 1:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC, upon Defendant Chersti Croft served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chersti Croft, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 02/05 9:39 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 12/20/2023, the court Ordered Plaintiff to Show Cause in writing ("OSC") why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Dkt. 12 ) Plaintiff filed a Proof of Service on 2/2/2024. The Court accepts the Proof of Service as a Response to the Order to Show Cause. Having reviewed Plaintiff's response, the court DISCHARGES the OSC. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 02/02 7:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC, upon Defendant Paul Croft served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Croft - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 12/20 11:51 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (DKT.10 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court issued an Order to Show Cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution (Dkt.10 ) (the "OSC"). Plaintiff was directed to file a response to the OSC no later than 12/12/23. Upon review of the timely-filed Response (Dkt.11 ), the Court grants in part the request for additional time to serve Defendants. On or before 2/12/24, Plaintiff shall serve Defendants and file a proof of service. In light of the foregoing, the OSC is continued to 2/12/24. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
11 11 misc Declaration Tue 12/12 12:32 PM
DECLARATION of Gregg S. Garfinkel re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,10 filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC.(Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachment 3
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/06 7:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 12/12/23, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint (however, if the deadline to Answer has already passed, plaintiff(s) must also submit a Request for Default or Stipulation Extending Time to Answer) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (FRCivP 41). (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 08/25 3:46 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/25 1:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Chersti Croft, Paul Croft. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 08/25 1:22 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/25 1:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 08/25 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 08/24 5:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/24 5:12 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC, (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/24 5:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/24 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35923222 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff United Van Lines LLC. (Attorney Gregg S Garfinkel added to party United Van Lines LLC(pty:pla))(Garfinkel, Gregg)
Related: [-]