Ross v. Bachand et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas L Ludington |
Referred: | R Steven Whalen |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-14122 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 11:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
GRETCHEN OWOCKI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PATRICIA CAVANAUGH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUSIE EMOND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CATHY FERGUSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID GAMEZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERIC GILBERTSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEBORAH HUNTLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFREY MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK MCCARTNEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN MOONINGHAM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCOTT CARMONA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONG PARK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SURENDER REDDY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARCIA SHANNON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERIK TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT TUTTLE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JENEE VELASQUEZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM WILLIAMSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEOLA WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEROME YANTZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BROOKS BYAM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald Bachand
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shaun Bangert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deborah Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Stewart French
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Lane
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saginaw Valley State University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saun Strobel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Surfield
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jill Wetmore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID ABBS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R. L. Ross
29106 Glencastle Drove
Farmington Hills, MI 48336 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
25
pgs
motion
Strike
Tue 01/13 7:10 PM
MOTION to Strike6 Answer to Complaint, Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, Stewart French, Robert Lane, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield. (Ross, Rhonda) Modified on 1/14/2015 (DWor). [DOCUMENT FILED BY R.L. ROSS] |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/13 1:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (as to Count 3 only) and with Reliance on Jury Demand by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore. (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Fri 01/09 9:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore. (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A = Richards v Ohio Civil Service Employees Ass'n, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B = Watford v Union County College, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C = Jewel v Chrysler, LLC & UAW, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D = Unfair Labor Practice Charge, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E = Dean v City of Bay City, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F = Forth v The Kroger Co, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G = McGuirk v Sabo | ||
Thursday, January 08, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 01/08 3:14 PM
REPLY to Response re5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore. (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A = Google Maps, SD Courthouse to SVSU, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B = Google Maps, ND Courthouse to Farmington Hills, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C = MSU webpage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D = Michigan Dispute Resolution Center webpage, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E = MSU course schedules | ||
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 01/07 8:15 AM
ORDER Granting10 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (CCoh) |
|
Monday, January 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 01/05 3:19 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore. (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A = Waiver of Service forms signed by Defendants SVSU, Bachand and Wetmore, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B = Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons forms sent to Defendants SVSU, Bachand and Wetmore dated November 14, 2014, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C = Draft copy of Defendants' proposed Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, January 01, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
22
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/01 9:16 PM
RESPONSE to5 MOTION to Change Venue PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by R. L. Ross. (Ross, Rhonda) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit SVSU WEBPAGE FOR THE SVSU MACOMB COUNTY REGIONAL EDUCATION CENTER, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit LIST OF PUBLIC SCHOOL ACADEMIES (PSAs) SVSU OPERATES INCLUDING THOSE IN THE METRO DETROIT AREA, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit COPY OF SVSUS LETTER CONSTRUCTIVELY DENYING PLAINTIFFS FOIA REQUEST BY REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PAY $84,000 FOR A FEW EMAILS | ||
Wednesday, December 31, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Wed 12/31 11:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Donald Bachand waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saginaw Valley State University waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Jill Wetmore waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Ross, Rhonda) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Wed 12/31 11:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shaun Bangert waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Deborah Bishop waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Stewart French waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Robert Lane waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saun Strobel waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Christopher Surfield waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Ross, Rhonda) |
|
Wednesday, December 24, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
52
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/24 12:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint by Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, Stewart French, Robert Lane, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield. (Iorio, Fillipe) |
|
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Change Venue
Fri 12/19 3:42 PM
MOTION to Change Venue by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore. (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A = SVSU Faculty Association web page, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B = MEA Central Zone web page, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C = Ghaith v Rauschenberger | ||
4 | 4
misc
Attorney Appearance
Fri 12/19 3:29 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fillipe S. Iorio appearing on behalf of Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, Stewart French, Robert Lane, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield Appearance (Iorio, Fillipe) |
|
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/09 9:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re2 Attorney Appearance by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Attorney Appearance
Tue 12/09 9:22 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie H. Nisidis appearing on behalf of Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore (Nisidis, Jamie) |
|
Monday, October 27, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 53 pgs COMPLAINT filed by R. L. Ross against All Defendants Receipt No: 072923 - Fee: $ 400. (Sandusky, K) |