Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00380
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 25, 2023 2:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Renita Barringer (2)
Represented By
William J. Ekiss
Ekiss Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Sonny Saggar (1)
Represented By
James G. Martin
Dowd Bennett Llp - St. Louis
contact info
James B. Martin
Dowd Bennett Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amy E. Sestric
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info

GPO May 28 2024
ORDER as to Sonny Saggar, Renita Barringer: The Court sustains, adopts, and incorporates United States Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen's 80 Report and Recommendation, and denies Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss and 47 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 5/28/24. (JAB)ORDER as to Sonny Saggar, Renita Barringer: The Court sustains, adopts, and incorporates United States Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen's 80 Report and Recommendation, and denies Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss and 47 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 5/28/24. (JAB)

Docket last updated: 02/20/2025 9:54 PM CST
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
Warrants Issued as to Indictment in case as to Sonny Saggar, Renita Barringer. (DLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on July 26, 2023 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen as to Sonny Saggar (1) count(s) 1, 2-9, Renita Barringer (2) count(s) 1, 2-9. FORFEITURE ALLEGATION (DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 15 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on July 26, 2023 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen as to Sonny Saggar (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2-9 is now count 2r-9r. Renita Barringer (2): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2-9 is now count 2r-9r. (DLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amy E. Sestric appearing for USA. (DLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order:...IT IS BY THE COURT ORDERED that said indictment shall be sealed and suppressed by the Clerk of the Court until said defendant is in custody or has given bail for the defendant's final appearance. Order as to Sonny Saggar, Renita Barringer. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on July 26, 2023. (DLB)
Related: [-]