Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:23-sw-00189
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 25, 2023 4:08 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul F. Daly, Jr.
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The premises located at 7 Simon Templar Drive, Coventry, Rhode Island 02816 (1)
Terminated: 07/27/2023


Docket last updated: 08/25/2023 4:45 AM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
Case as to The premises located at 7 Simon Templar Drive, Coventry, Rhode Island 02816 assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal re 1 APPLICATION for Search Warrant by USA as to The premises located at 7 Simon Templar Drive, Coventry, Rhode Island 02816. Responses due by 8/9/2023. (Daly, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 MOTION to Seal re 1 APPLICATION for Search Warrant as to The premises located at 7 Simon Templar Drive, Coventry, Rhode Island 02816 (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/26/2023.(Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]