Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-06821

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David D Cleary
Case #: 1:23-ap-00254
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Muwafak S Rizek
7924 Keystone Rd
Orland Park, IL 60462
Represented By
Muwafak S Rizek
contact info
Plaintiff
Huntington National Bank
27777 Franklin Road Suite 2500
Southfield, MI 48034
Represented By
William J Serritella
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Kimberly Ross Clayson
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
40 40 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 03/19 11:13 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/04/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, March 17, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/17 11:51 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Yeoeun C Yoon on behalf of Huntington National Bank. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
38 38 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 03/05 12:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/19/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
37 37 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 02/05 11:34 AM
(E)Discovery Cutoff Extended to 3/12/2025, Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/05/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
36 36 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/22 11:32 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Discovery Deadline Extended to 2/12/2025, Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/05/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
35 35 order Generic Order Wed 10/09 4:28 PM
Order On Discovery Deadlines Related [+]. Signed on 9/11/2024 (Miller, Marvin)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel
34 34 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 09/11 3:38 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/22/2025 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, September 09, 2024
33 33 misc Proposed Order Mon 09/09 2:08 PM
Proposed Order - Joint Order on Discovery Deadlines Filed by Yeoeun C Yoon on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
32 32 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 09/04 12:21 PM
(E)D.O.T.F. - Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 25 Compel
31 31 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 09/04 12:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
30 30 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/21 12:43 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 09/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 25 Compel
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
29 29 answer Reply Wed 08/14 1:03 PM
Reply in Support to Related [+] Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank (Serritella, William)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
28 28 answer Response Tue 07/30 11:24 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by David R Herzog on behalf of Muwafak S Rizek (Herzog, David)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
27 27 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/17 11:55 AM
(E)Response Due by 7/31/2024, Reply Due by 8/14/2024, Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 08/21/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 25 Compel
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
26 26 notice 2-Notice of Motion Tue 07/09 9:53 AM
Notice of Motion Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel
25 25 motion Compel Tue 07/09 9:51 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Rizek to produce communications responsive to adversary proceeding Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Att: 14 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
24 24 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 06/26 1:07 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
23 23 court Hearing Concluded (Motion) Wed 06/05 10:27 AM
(E)Hearing Concluded Related [+]. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank.
22 22 order Compel Wed 06/05 10:27 AM
(E)Order Withdrawing Motion To Compel Related [+] (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
21 21 motion Withdraw Tue 06/04 12:44 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank. Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Objection (Text Only) Fri 05/31 10:15 AM
Notice of Objection Filed by David R Herzog on behalf of Muwafak S Rizek Related [+]. (Herzog, David)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compel
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Order Tue 05/28 11:21 AM
Proposed Order - The Huntington National Bank's Motion to Compel Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compel
18 18 utility U - Corrective Entry Tue 05/28 9:53 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF Error, Filer to Refile Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 17 Proposed Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/24 3:04 PM
Proposed Order - Motion to Compel Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compel
16 16 notice 2-Notice of Motion Fri 05/24 2:26 PM
Notice of Motion Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compel
15 15 motion Compel Fri 05/24 2:24 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Debtor to to Produce Filed by William J Serritella on behalf of Huntington National Bank. Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Serritella, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/24 2:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/23 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Yeoeun C Yoon on behalf of Huntington National Bank. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/31 12:03 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/04 12:45 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/31/2024 at 10:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary.. Signed on 10/04/2023. (Beckerman, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/28 1:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by David R Herzog on behalf of Muwafak S Rizek. (Herzog, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
9 9 misc Appearance Tue 09/26 9:45 AM
Appearance Filed by David R Herzog on behalf of Muwafak S Rizek. (Herzog, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 08/28 4:03 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Filed by Kimberly Ross Clayson on behalf of Huntington National Bank. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/25 11:44 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Muwafak S Rizek Related [+]. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
6 6 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Fri 08/25 11:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Kimberly Ross Clayson on behalf of Huntington National Bank Related [+]. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 08/25 9:52 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY PDF Error, Filer to Refile as Amended Related [+]. (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed
4 4 crditcrd none Fri 08/25 7:35 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-00254 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46831073. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Clayson, Kimberly) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, August 24, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/24 3:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Muwafak S Rizek Related [+]. (Clayson, Kimberly) Modified on 8/25/2023 PDF Error, Filer to Refile as Amended (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 08/24 3:09 PM
Summons Issued on Muwafak S Rizek Answer Due 09/25/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/24 3:08 PM
Adversary case 23-00254 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): Complaint by Huntington National Bank against Muwafak S Rizek. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 10/4/2023 at 10:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
Att: 8 Exhibit
Att: 9 Exhibit
Att: 10 Exhibit
Att: 11 Exhibit