Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-04188
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2023
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 8:23-cv-01597
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Defendant
John Doe 1-49
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael David Sloan
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Angus Internation Safety Group Ltd.
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael David Sloan
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Plaintiff
City of Plant City
Represented By
Louise R Caro
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Laura Jacobs Donaldson
Southwest Florida Water Management District
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/09 7:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 17, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/17 8:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope A
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
21 21 service Summons Issued Wed 08/30 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
20 20 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 08/25 2:13 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle (associated as of 8/21/2023), 8:23-cv-01597, City of Plant City v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04188-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
18 18 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 08/25 2:04 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:23-cv-01597. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
17 17 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of South Carolina. MDL case number: 2873. (AG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
16 16 NOTICE by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP Notice of Filing Conditional Transfer Order from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation(Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order (Finalized)
15 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 11 Order5 Standing Order by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc. for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
14 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by City of Plant City. Related case(s): No (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
13 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by City of Plant City. (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
11 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Tyco Fire Products' and Chemguard's 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "ownership however small of a party's shares or stock," not simply those whose ownership constitutes 10% or more. See (Doc. 5 ) at 8. Tyco Fire Products and Chemguard must file a new statement using the form attached to the 5 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
10 10 ENDORSED ORDER: The 5 Civil Case Order requires the parties to submit a notice of related actions and corporate disclosure statements within fourteen days after appearing. Plant City fails to submit a corporate disclosure statement, and the parties fail to submit a notice of related actions. The parties must submit the requisite documents no later than August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Plant City's complaint, (Doc. 1-1), is a shotgun pleading because Counts II through VII "reallege[] and reaffirm[] all allegations set forth in the preceding paragraphs." Id. ; see Weiland v. Palm Beach Cnty. Sheriff's Off. , 792 F.3d 1313, 1321 (11th Cir. 2015) ("The most common type [of shotgun pleading]--by a long shot--is a complaint containing multiple counts where each count adopts the allegations of all preceding counts, causing each successive count to carry all that came before and the last count to be a combination of the entire complaint."). Accordingly, Plant City's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plant City must submit an amended complaint no later than August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/7/2023. (JMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
8 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Tyco Fire Products and Chemguard must answer the Plaintiff's complaint no later than twenty-eight days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision on the transfer of this action to In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation , Case No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (D.S.C.). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/21/2023. (JMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc. for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Sloan, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2023 to edit text (ABC). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 20, 2023
5 5 CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after removal. Each party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/20/2023. (JMP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
4 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Heidi Levine, Keith Bensten, Jonathan Handler, Michael Sloan, Melanie Black Dubis, Charles Raynal IV, Brent Dwerlkotte, David Erickson, Tyler Alfermann, Daniel Ring, John Wellshlager, John Parker, Oliver Twaddell, Kat Hacker, Ethan Ware, Clifford Zatz, Kurt Douglas Weaver, Clifton Brinson, Addie Ries, Kirk Warner, and Keith Smith Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Louise R. Caro and Laura Jacobs Donaldson of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-1597-KKM-CPT. (ABC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of Plant City v 3M Company, case number 23-CA-012738 filed in State Court on 05/24/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21049108 filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet