Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-04203
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00892
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Lightfoot Franklin And White LLC
contact info
M Christian King
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
William Larkin Radney, IV
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Wesley B Gilchrist
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By
Paige Pavone
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Represented By
Paige Pavone
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
Plaintiff
COLLIN DELP
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES O. DERRICK
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIM A. DESHANO
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DWAYNE DESHOTEL
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD GLENN DETAMBLE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CLYDE DIBBLE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TODD DICINE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARC DICKERSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT DIRKS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GLENN DOMEN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRAN DONNELLY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SEAN DOS SANTOS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK DUGGAR
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE DUNCAN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEITH DUNLAP
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES DUROY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD DUSKIN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL R. DUTTON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
STANLEY DYER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFF DZADON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES K. EDWARDS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE ELLIS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS C. EMMONS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES ESPY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID A ESTRADA
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK LEE EVANGELISTA
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAMARIO R. EVANS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN FANNING
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID FARE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WAYNE FENLEY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANCIS FERRARI
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMERSON FERRELL
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL FITZGERALD
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CLIFTON O. FLEMING
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DALE FLETCHER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CALVIN FLING
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MAURICE FLOWERS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM FORSSTROM
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SARA FOX
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY FRANCIS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CONLEY J. FREDERICK
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD FRENCH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EFFICE FRICK
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH FULKERSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENT FULTON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROGER L. FULTZ
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Flint
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Curtis Frazier
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW GALEOTO
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GALLAGHER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN W. GARVIN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED GARZA
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH RANDALL GASSAWAY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID EDWARD GAUDETTE, JR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT GERTH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM GIARRUSSO
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CURTIS A. GIBSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JON TREVIN GILLAM
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
STANLEY GILLCASH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFERY GILPIN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS GOMEZ
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD GOULD
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM GOWER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDY GRANDERSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY PJ GRANLUND
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GLENN G GRAVES
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MELVIN GREGORY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID GREGURICH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN GROVES
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK GURLEY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID GUTIERREZ
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Gallo
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Gamble
283317 Ridgeland Correctional Institution PO Box 2039
Ridgeland, SC 29936
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert George
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Giles
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Green
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Greene
Georgetown County Detention Center 2394 Browns Ferry Road
Georgetown, SC 29440
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Grimes
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGORY HAGANS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HAMDLIN, SR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD HAMMONS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEN HANSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MALCOLM BENNETT HARDING
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL W. HARRINGTON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSIE E. HARRIS, JR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HARWIG
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALVIN HAYES
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GARY HAYES
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH RAY HEBERT
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GARY M. HENDRICKSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM J. HENDRICKSON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TODD HENLEY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE W HENSLEY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIRK HEYEN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY HINDS
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE W. HINES
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ARCHIE HINTON, JR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN HOCHMUTH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRY HOFFER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL J. HOFFMAN
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
LLOYD HOFFMAN;
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES HOLBERT
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARION ANDREW HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SID HONE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE B. HOOPER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES HOPGOOD
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANNON HORNE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN M. HORTON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WALTER JAMES HORTON, SR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRY HOSIE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEAN HOUSE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEOFFREY HOUSE
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS HOUSER
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT HOUSTON
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FREDRICK P. HOWK, JR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIAN J HOYTE, JR.
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGORY HUDZIK
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Hammock
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Hardy
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Hart
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Hatfield
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Herrera
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Hines
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Howard
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD JOSEPH ZWOLENSKY
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
RADO EDWARDS
Terminated: 12/11/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY FRITTS
Terminated: 08/30/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Fox
Terminated: 10/19/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN GANN
Terminated: 10/11/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CARL GEORGE
Terminated: 10/19/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JIM HENSLEY
Terminated: 12/11/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGORY HOLMES
Terminated: 08/30/2023
Represented By
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/05 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bobby Joe Lambert, Gregory John Crispo, LAWRENCE ELLIS, Roshonda Bailey, Jay Smith, Robert Underwood, Kenneth Whaley, Eric Anthony Jordan, Steven Troy Fisher, Michael Zepeda, Charles C Marshall, Robert Parker, Johnarfin Goodjoint, Van Bass, David Ammons, Norman B Chapman, Randall Bonds, Keith Michael Burkhalter, Sheri Carlson, Micheal Francis, John Hanson, Patrick F Roberts, Ronald Hansen, Mark Bryant, Shaun Deprez, Nicholas James Lewis, James Norman, Bilal A Malik, David Rivera, Timothy H Sinex, James Edward Taylor John Leston as to Jones, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Member Cases
Thursday, October 17, 2024
45 45 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/17 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lester Budden Et al., Somone Solomon, John P Morin, Robert Paulin, Jason Randle, Claude Roberts, Jeffrey Scoggins, Arthur Ellis, Jr, Lawrence Hays, Jerie Fletcher, Gerard Hayes, Stuart Packer, Jerol Smith, Kenneth Swinehart, Joseph Michauskas Et al., James Beal, Glenn Howard, Charles Edward Jones, Earl Evans, Harold W Longacre, Paul Beale, Marvin Joe Davis, Ronald Caleb White, Christopher Colvin, Robert Bruce Barron, Daniel Green, Eric Nilson Et al. Olie Olesen as to Nilson, et al; John Woodall as to Jones, et al; Timothy Borland as to Budden, et al; Keith Bluestein as to Michauskas, et al; Jeffrey Calhoun as to Michauskas, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Donald LeHew as to Colvin, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/03 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Norman Knight, Joe Lafrance, Murl McMillion, LESLI LANDERER, LEONARD JAY MCINTIRE, Hershel Brown, Vinson Butler, Jerry Croom, Christopher Burris Et al., Thomas Thomas, Kenneth Williams, Ronald Eugene Wilson, Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Jesse Myrick, Eduardo Borela, John Borodkin, Joseph Bowman, Arceal Butler, Sr, Kevin D Cagle, Carlos Caseres, Brian Daniels, Dale Davis, Larry Beemer Et al., James Rozier, Ronald Shockley, RICHARD GLENN DETAMBLE, MICHAEL GALLAGHER, Thomas Martin Et al., Larry German Et al. George Robert Bartlett, Sr. as to German, et al; Perry William Clark as to German, et al; Timothy Aaron Jones as to German, et al; Richard James Chappuis as to Martin, et al; Alan Mark Cosgrove as to Martin, et al; Eugene Perry Forte as to Martin, et al; Christopher William Manfredi as to Martin, et al; Patrick K. McCarthy as to Martin, et al; Alward Fuller Rhew as to Martin, et al; Bruce Swanson as to Martin, et al; Scott Richard Trudell as to Martin, et al; Timothy Paul Nandy as to Shaw, et al; Michael Carl Smith as to Shaw, et al; Larry Warren as to Shaw, et al; Cornelius Wesley as to Shaw, et al; James K. Barnes as to Barnes, et al; Thomas J. Beaudette as to Barnes, et al; Lloyd Nolan Crawford as to Barnes, et al; Kevin Jay Reichert as to Barnes, et al; Richard Thomas Riehle as to Barnes, et al; Michael David Shelton as to Barnes, et al; James Thomas Lane as to Beemer, et al; Michael David Paulette as to Beemer, et al; Rossten Edgar Stroude as to Beemer, et al; Robbie Dotson as to Burris, et al; William Riddock; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
42 42 misc Status Report Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allan Banks, DONN JOHNSON, BILLY LIPPSE, GREGORY LOGAN, JOHN MANNING, DENNIS MCENTYRE, LOUIS MCLELLAN, SR, MICHAEL MENGEL, AUSTIN MILLER, Doug Morgan, Ronald Lee Bogo, George Michael Brooks, Brian Burks, Jose Castro, Maynard Coleman, James Cutino, Michael P Sprinkle, William St. Claire, Sr, Albert A Stone, Brian P Szwec, Donald Vessey, Lee Vetsch, Archie Walker, Collie Washington, Ronald Williams, Rex Alan Wilson, James Wunderlich, Kimberly Wyttenberg, David Lee Lineberger, Edward Earl Johnson, Stuart Mahaffey, David Wayne Muckerheide, Kingsley Washington Nelson, James O'Brien, Victor Orvis, William Partain, Richard J Peck, Terry Peters, Octavio Plascencia, GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR, CHARLES ESPY, ANDY GRANDERSON, GLENN G GRAVES, DAVID GUTIERREZ, KIRK HEYEN, JOHN HOCHMUTH, LLOYD HOFFMAN; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/31 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CLIFTON O. FLEMING, CALVIN FLING, MAURICE FLOWERS, CONLEY J. FREDERICK, KENNETH FULKERSON, JOHN W. GARVIN, DAVID EDWARD GAUDETTE, JR, WILLIAM GIARRUSSO, CURTIS A. GIBSON, WILLIAM GOWER, JEFFREY PJ GRANLUND, MELVIN GREGORY, KEVIN GROVES, James Greene, Kevin Grimes, EDWARD HAMMONS, MALCOLM BENNETT HARDING, MICHAEL W. HARRINGTON, JESSIE E. HARRIS, JR, GARY HAYES, GARY M. HENDRICKSON, GEORGE W HENSLEY, GEORGE W. HINES, ARCHIE HINTON, JR, DANIEL J. HOFFMAN, JAMES HOLBERT, MARION ANDREW HOLLINGSWORTH, SID HONE, JAMES HOPGOOD, SHANNON HORNE, SHAWN M. HORTON, WALTER JAMES HORTON, SR, TERRY HOSIE, GEOFFREY HOUSE, JULIAN J HOYTE, JR, GREGORY HUDZIK, Brian Hardy, Dale August, Gerald Belle, Larry German Et al. Rick Steven Bennett as to German, et al; Louis O. Blalock as to German, et al; Roy Jerome Chaplik, Sr. as to German, et al; Charles C. Clark as to German, et al; Derrick Day as to German, et al; Paul Russell Diehl as to German, et al; Michael Justin Ferrebee as to German, et al; David Brent Franklin as to German, et al; Ray L. Freeman as to German, et al; James Patrick Hoffman as to German, et al; Michael Lavelle Kelly as to German, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG, 2:23-cv-04525-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/30 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KIM A. DESHANO, DWAYNE DESHOTEL, TODD DICINE, ROBERT DIRKS, GLENN DOMEN, SEAN DOS SANTOS, GEORGE DUNCAN, KEITH DUNLAP, JAMES DUROY, PAUL R. DUTTON, JAMES K. EDWARDS, DAVID A ESTRADA, PATRICK LEE EVANGELISTA, SHAWN FANNING, WAYNE FENLEY, JAMERSON FERRELL, DANIEL FITZGERALD, MICHAEL J. KRUSE, GLEN LAIRD, KENNETH LANDERS, THOMAS LAPIANA, DAVID A. LEWIS, VICK LOFTIN, MICHAEL LOFTON, LESLIE LUNASCO, KEVIN LYNCH, MATTHEW MARCARELLI, DONALD MARSH, JEFFERY MATTHEWS, THOMAS MAYNARD, DARRELL MAZYCK, EARL MCCOLLIGAN, VERNON MCDONALD, DALE MCINNIS, DENNIS MCLOYD, BRIAN MCMAHAN, PAUL MCWILLIAMS, IVO MEDIC, FRANTZH MENNE, JR, MARTIN F. MICHELS, ROBERT E. MIXON, DAVID KENTON MORGAN, Michael F Martin, William Martin, Willie Martin, John McKee, John McQueen, John Miller, Stephen Miller, Richard Moore WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04202-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Thursday, July 18, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/18 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT JENNEY, PETER KROM, Don Knight, TONY LUCAS, Richard Legg, JOHN MCPOLIN, James Antley, James Cline, Dennis Cox, Xavier Dehoyos, Michael George Kerby, Rex Charles Lambert, Ronald Jack Lambert, Jr, David W Lester, Noel Manheimer, Kevin James Martin, Raymond Vadeboncoeur, Richard Wagner, William O Warnock, II, Gary Hanna Et al., James O'Donnell, Gregory Paxton, Richard M Reass, William Joseph Rios, Richard James Savidge, Scott Schroeder, Robert Leon Seago, Thomas Martin Et al., ROGER L. FULTZ, DAVID GREGURICH, Robert George, GREGORY HOLMES, Larry German Et al. Alton Brown as to German, et al; Anthony Dukes as to German, et al; Charles Wayne Fletcher as to German, et al; William Wesley Hagins as to German, et al; Charles David Hickman as to German, et al; Dana Hubbard as to German, et al; Daniel Johnson as to German, et al; Chil Ledford as to German, et al; Ronald Charles Maupin as to German, et al; James McTaggert as to German, et al; Louis H. Pauly as to German, et al; Jesse Randal Rodriguez as to German, et al; Walter Gerard Saverse as to German, et al; Scott Joseph Sweeney as to German, et al; Richard Wood as to German, et al; David Ray Yeager as to German, et al; Bernard Joseph Zielinski, Jr. as to German, et al; Gary Hanna as to Hanna, et al; Quarri A Anderson as to Martin, et al; Michael Bednorz, Jr. as to Martin, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/17 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., John L. Humphrey Et al., Christopher Burris Et al., Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Larry Beemer Et al., KEN HANSON, Thomas Martin Et al., Larry German Et al. Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry German Et al as to David William Althouse, Esequiel Marez Campos III, Gary Joseph Demarco, Rigoberto D'Leon, Gibson O'Neal Fallaw Jr., Duane H. Gardner, Jack Phillip Macfarlane, Richard Wayne Nelson, Robert Osborne, Stanley Peoples, Richard Rollins, Robert Lee Schackmuth, Darryl James Taresh, Jimmy Dee Zachary; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by John L. Humphrey Et al as to Raul Gil; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Thomas Martin Et al as to Arie Dale Owen, Craig Quentin Pittman, Rory Dale Swiggett, Rudolph Benjamin Lavarne Whitehurst, Michael Thomas Whittaker; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al as to Forrest Anthony Brown, John Anthony Casinelli, Jesse Carlos Espinoza, Michael Henry Fauss, Troy Jonathan Gigante, Kevin Alan Smoes, Samuel Wayne Wray; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Allen Barnes Et al as to Randolph Wesley Babb, Gregory Michael Claudy, Thomas Glenn Hazelwood, James Leroy Smith, Thomas James Stuart; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry Beemer Et al as to Peter Paul Ferrante Jr., Garold Chester Fillgrove, Charles Ernest Flinn III, Robert Joseph Kulak, Dennis Irving Olsen, Andrew Belfert Theadford Jr., Samuel Vazquez Jr., James Clifton Whitfield Jr.; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Burris Et al as to James Roy Aitken, Stephen William Bruno Sr., Gregory Antonio Favors, Michael Dee Fernandez, Greg Bennett Hummel, Daniel Joseph Johnson, Givens Lenvel Redmond, Robert L. Stacey, Rodney Andrew Wangelin; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/17 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Neal Almand, William Rene Arnold, Loyd N Belgarde, Eric Mitchell Campbell, JAMES LEIGHTON KNICKERBOCKER, BRIAN KUTA, James Kilgore, NORVEL LAUHON, RICHARD LAWLESS, DENNIS A. LOUSHE, William Long, PAUL MAGANA, JOE MOREINO, Michael McNeil, Daniel Bonkowski, James Burns, Dougs Cassidy, Burtis Caudill, Tyrone Johnson, Wayne Jones, Edward Klein, Patrick Steven Leon, Alonzo Martinez, Thomas Spalding, Jr, William Stalvey, Reginald Maurice Thomas, Alvin Dwain Washington, Sr, Herbert R Weston, James Joseph Quirk, Joseph Gerard Rizzo, Beryl S Roberts, Jr, Paul Rosenbaum, William Mason Rush, Donald Williams Sabo, Jr, Daniel Pichardo, Casey Porter, Christopher Nathaniel Riley, Ronald Saferite, EDWARD FRENCH, ROBERT GERTH, STANLEY GILLCASH, Robert Gallo, David Gamble, GREGORY HAGANS, James Hammock, Terry Raymond McCall, Rashad McNulty, David Ronald Palumbo, Christopher David Posante, Jay Foster Dill WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/16 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Ira Marion Judge, Charles Anthony Kent, Sr, Roy L Kent, Charles Edward King, Michael Kown, Gerald Joel Lack, Clovile Calvin Lemieux, William Joseph Lemons, Jr, Michael Allen Lively, Eric Logiudice, Michael Rafael Lopez, Edward Fred Malanda, Christopher Burris Et al., Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Larry Beemer Et al., Stewart Acosta, KENNETH RAY HEBERT, Thomas Martin Et al., Larry German Et al. Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry German Et al as to Willard Fredrick Alabran, Esequiel Marez Campos III, Roger Brian Drake, Jimmy Britt Freeman, Douglas Howard Snyder, John Stevens, Bruce A. WIlliams; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Thomas Martin Et al as to Francis Joseph Bock, Paul Brodowsky, Robert Russell Evans Jr., William Otis Fears, Isaac Henry Fillyaw Jr., Michael Dominick Vanacore; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al as to Jeffrey Michael Byrne, Frederick Espy, Gregory Keith Fluckey, Charles Quentin Fluharty, Willie Mitchell, Kenneth Charles Shaw, Jeffrey Wayne Switzer, Arthur Watson, Steven Lee Wintersteen, Gene Frank Youderian; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Allen Barnes Et al as to David Arthur DeBee, Joseph Dextor Peirce V, George David Tamburello; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry Beemer Et al as to Wendell Callaway, Jeremiah Mullins Sr., Robert Watson, Mark Allen Williams; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Burris Et al as to Otis Wade Byrd II, Charles Cruver, Thomas Donald Gaertner, Charles Rasico, Charles John Rizzo, Maurice Glen Sutton; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases
Thursday, June 06, 2024
31 31 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of DAMARIO R. EVANS, SHAWN FANNING(Matteis, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/11 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JIM HENSLEY WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/11 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RADO EDWARDS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/19 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CARL GEORGE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/19 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Fox WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/11 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN GANN WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/30 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JEFFREY FRITTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/30 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GREGORY HOLMES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04203-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
9 9 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 08/25 2:57 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 8/22/2023), 2:23-cv-00892, Garza et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04203-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 08/25 2:54 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
6 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL No. 2873: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No. 2873; Copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to Clerk of Court in the District of South Carolina. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
5 5 TEXT ORDER : Defendant 3M Company's "Unopposed Initial Motion For Extension Of Time" (Doc.3 ) is GRANTED . Defendant's responsive pleading now is due on or before the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 7/11/2023. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
4 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint,1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-901984.00., filed by 3M Company.(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FRED GARZA, et al. (Deemed filed 6/9/2023 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]
Filing Fee received in the amount of $402.00, Credit Card receipt_number AALNDC-4379112, NDAL receipt #B6191. (Radney, W) Modified on 7/10/2023 (JLC). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.]
Related: [-]