New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-11724
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2023
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2024 6:10 AM EST
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC.
Defendant
KENVUE, INC.
Defendant
LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
SARAH HOWIE
Represented By
KURT ARNOLD
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Monday, February 19, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/19 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
mdl MDL Direct File Thu 10/05 10:14 AM
Member Case Direct File on 8/27/2023, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jxh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/08 10:04 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 08/27 11:10 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14594318) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SARAH HOWIE.(ARNOLD, KURT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet