Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11294

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:23-bk-11333
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2023

Debtor
AgileThought Digital Solutions, S.A.P.I. de C.V.

,
Represented By
Jeremy William Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 27, 2023
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 10/27 6:09 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by AgileThought Digital Solutions, S.A.P.I. de C.V.. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 08/29 7:01 PM
Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a) Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) And Local Rule 1015-1 Directing Joint Administration Of the Debtors Related Chapter 11 Cases " An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the 8 Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases commenced concurrently by AN Global LLC and the debtors in the above-captioned cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of AN Global LLC, Case No. 23-11294 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Signed on 8/29/2023 (AJL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 08/28 10:42 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-11333 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11225229, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Mon 08/28 6:30 AM
Motion for Joint Administration // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed By AgileThought Digital Solutions, S.A.P.I. de C.V. (Ryan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 08/28 4:33 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by AgileThought Digital Solutions, S.A.P.I. de C.V.. (Ryan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 08/28 9:27 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH)
Related: [-]