New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:23-cv-07609
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2023
Terminated:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2024 4:55 AM EST
Defendant
Sul-Hous Holdings LLC
Defendant
Sullivan Street Partners I, LLC
Plaintiff
Joseph Volfman
Represented By
Andre Autz
Nacmias Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/31 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Joseph Volfman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
9 9 order Order of Dismissal Thu 10/05 2:19 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/5/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/04 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Joseph Volfman..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
7 7 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 08/30 12:57 PM
ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. As further set forth by this Order. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/30/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/29 11:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sullivan Street Partners I, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 08/29 11:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sul-Hous Holdings LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 08/29 11:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andre Autz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 08/29 11:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 08/29 11:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 08/29 11:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/28 11:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SULLIVAN STREET PARTNERS I, LLC dba BAR MOGA, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Volfman..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/28 11:38 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SUL-HOUS HOLDINGS LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Volfman..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/28 11:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/28 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Sul-Hous Holdings LLC, Sullivan Street Partners I, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28205032)Document filed by Joseph Volfman..(Autz, Andre)
Related: [-]