New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Case #: 1:23-cv-07680
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Jimmy Andrade
Represented By
George Dean Vallas
Greenwald Doherty LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Corps.
Defendant
KVL Painting Services Corp.
Represented By
George Dean Vallas
Greenwald Doherty LLP
contact info
Defendant
Total Home Improvement Services Inc.
Represented By
George Dean Vallas
Greenwald Doherty LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Rodriguez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Manuel Martinez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Presa
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Walter Perez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduardo Perez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Carlos Pena
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Carlos Pea
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Manuel Ortiz
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yaned Orrego
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Molina
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Saul Bruno Meza Onofre
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gustavo Mera
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gustavo Mena
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilson Martinez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marco Zapata
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Delmer Rosales
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Ruda
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fabian Sanchez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Sanchez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cesar A Tobon
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnatan Torres
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jair Valoy Riascos
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduard Varela Guaitaco
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Olga Vargas
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Velasco
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marlon Andres Vera Vargas
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Yusti Puentes
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilfer Yusti Puentes
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hugo Albornoz Mina
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector Escamilla
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Danny Hernandez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Mayancela
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Ramirez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonardo Arboleda
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Benitez Payan
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Brea
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Willy Brea
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonia Buitrago
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Cardenas
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduin Carranza
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosalyn Cortavarria
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosa Crespo
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Raul Cruz
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Del Aguila
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katerine Martinez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sergio Escobar Isaza
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nay Figueroa
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Gonzalez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Manuel Gonzalez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nelson Granados
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Johan Gutierrez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Hernandez Cardenas
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Duban Jimenez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Javier Jimenez Gonzalez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Jutinico
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hugo Lopez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Lopez
Represented By
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Lopez
Represented By
Camille Andrea Sanchez
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
98 98 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 12/27 3:18 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:96 Judgment entered In favor of Leonardo Arboleda Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Benitez Payan Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Henry Brea Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Willy Brea Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Sonia Buitrago Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Diana Cardenas Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Eduin Carranza Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Iris Chacon Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Rosalyn Cortavarria Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of David Cortes Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Rosa Crespo Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Raul Cruz Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Rafael Del Aguila Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Hector Escamilla Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Sergio Escobar Isaza Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Nay Figueroa Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of John Gonzalez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Victor Manuel Gonzalez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Nelson Granados Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Johan Gutierrez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Danny Hernandez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Gabriel Hernandez Cardenas Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Duban Jimenez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Javier Jimenez Gonzalez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Jutinico Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Javier Londono Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Hugo Lopez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Lopez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Juan Lopez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Katerine Martinez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Manuel Martinez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Wilson Martinez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Christian Mayancela Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Gustavo Mena Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Gustavo Mera Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Saul Bruno Meza Onofre Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jonathan Molina Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Yaned Orrego Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Manuel Ortiz Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Carlos Pea Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Carlos Pena Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Eduardo Perez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Walter Perez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Francisco Presa Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of John Ramirez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Gabriel Rufino Revilla Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Diego Rodriguez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Francisco Rodriguez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Delmer Rosales Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Ronald Ruda Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Fabian Sanchez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Salvador Sanchez Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Cesar A Tobon Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Johnatan Torres Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jair Valoy Riascos Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Eduard Varela Guaitaco Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Olga Vargas Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Jose Velasco Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Marlon Andres Vera Vargas Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of John Yusti Puentes Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Wilfer Yusti Puentes Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Marco Zapata Against Total Home Improvement Services Inc., In favor of Hugo Albornoz Mina Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Leonardo Arboleda Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Benitez Payan Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Henry Brea Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Willy Brea Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Sonia Buitrago Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Diana Cardenas Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Eduin Carranza Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Iris Chacon Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Rosalyn Cortavarria Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of David Cortes Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Rosa Crespo Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Raul Cruz Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Rafael Del Aguila Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Hector Escamilla Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Sergio Escobar Isaza Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Nay Figueroa Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of John Gonzalez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Victor Manuel Gonzalez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Nelson Granados Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Johan Gutierrez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Danny Hernandez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Gabriel Hernandez Cardenas Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Duban Jimenez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Javier Jimenez Gonzalez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Jutinico Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Javier Londono Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Hugo Lopez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Lopez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Juan Lopez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Katerine Martinez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Manuel Martinez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Wilson Martinez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Christian Mayancela Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Gustavo Mena Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Gustavo Mera Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Saul Bruno Meza Onofre Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jonathan Molina Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Yaned Orrego Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Manuel Ortiz Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Carlos Pea Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Carlos Pena Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Eduardo Perez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Walter Perez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Francisco Presa Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of John Ramirez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Gabriel Rufino Revilla Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Diego Rodriguez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Francisco Rodriguez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Delmer Rosales Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Ronald Ruda Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Fabian Sanchez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Salvador Sanchez Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Cesar A Tobon Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Johnatan Torres Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jair Valoy Riascos Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Eduard Varela Guaitaco Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Olga Vargas Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Jose Velasco Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Marlon Andres Vera Vargas Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of John Yusti Puentes Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Wilfer Yusti Puentes Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Marco Zapata Against KVL Painting Services Corp., In favor of Hugo Albornoz Mina Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Leonardo Arboleda Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Benitez Payan Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Henry Brea Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Willy Brea Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Sonia Buitrago Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Diana Cardenas Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Eduin Carranza Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Iris Chacon Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Rosalyn Cortavarria Against John Doe Corps., In favor of David Cortes Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Rosa Crespo Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Raul Cruz Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Rafael Del Aguila Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Hector Escamilla Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Sergio Escobar Isaza Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Nay Figueroa Against John Doe Corps., In favor of John Gonzalez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Victor Manuel Gonzalez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Nelson Granados Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Johan Gutierrez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Danny Hernandez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Gabriel Hernandez Cardenas Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Duban Jimenez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Javier Jimenez Gonzalez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Jutinico Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Javier Londono Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Hugo Lopez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Lopez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Juan Lopez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Katerine Martinez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Manuel Martinez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Wilson Martinez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Christian Mayancela Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Gustavo Mena Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Gustavo Mera Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Saul Bruno Meza Onofre Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jonathan Molina Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Yaned Orrego Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Manuel Ortiz Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Carlos Pea Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Carlos Pena Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Eduardo Perez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Walter Perez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Francisco Presa Against John Doe Corps., In favor of John Ramirez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Gabriel Rufino Revilla Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Diego Rodriguez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Francisco Rodriguez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Delmer Rosales Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Ronald Ruda Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Fabian Sanchez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Salvador Sanchez Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Cesar A Tobon Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Johnatan Torres Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jair Valoy Riascos Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Eduard Varela Guaitaco Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Olga Vargas Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Jose Velasco Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Marlon Andres Vera Vargas Against John Doe Corps., In favor of John Yusti Puentes Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Wilfer Yusti Puentes Against John Doe Corps., In favor of Marco Zapata Against John Doe Corps. in the amount of $587,500.00. Judgment satisfied on 12/2/2024.. Document filed by Johan Gutierrez, Yaned Orrego, Katerine Martinez, Gustavo Mena, Jose Velasco, Saul Bruno Meza Onofre, Wilfer Yusti Puentes, John Yusti Puentes, Salvador Sanchez, Manuel Martinez, Jose Carlos Pea, Nelson Granados, Jose Carlos Pena, Gustavo Mera, Wilson Martinez, Francisco Presa, Olga Vargas, Victor Manuel Gonzalez, Jonathan Molina, Eduard Varela Guaitaco, Jair Valoy Riascos, Marco Zapata, Walter Perez, John Ramirez, Jose Jutinico, Javier Jimenez Gonzalez, Johnatan Torres, Marlon Andres Vera Vargas, Sergio Escobar Isaza, Fabian Sanchez, Cesar A Tobon, Hugo Lopez, Henry Brea, Duban Jimenez, Danny Hernandez, Manuel Ortiz, Rosalyn Cortavarria, Hector Escamilla, Delmer Rosales, Eduin Carranza, Ronald Ruda, Diana Cardenas, Rosa Crespo, Raul Cruz, Sonia Buitrago, Hugo Albornoz Mina, Nay Figueroa, Eduardo Perez, Leonardo Arboleda, Jose Lopez, John Gonzalez, Christian Mayancela, Gabriel Hernandez Cardenas, Juan Lopez, Willy Brea, Rafael Del Aguila, David Cortes, Javier Londono, Gabriel Rufino Revilla, Iris Chacon, Diego Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Benitez Payan..(nd)
Related: [-]
97 97 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 12/02 11:53 AM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by John Ramirez..(Cuadra, Gianfranco) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]